Massotti v. Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Massotti
Defendant: Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01471
Filed: November 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Religion)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2022 Filing 5 Letter to Delaware District Court, from Gary E. Junge, Esq., regarding Bayhealth Cases. (Junge, Gary) Modified on 11/29/2022 (nms).
November 17, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jennifer L. Massotti: For Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc. waiver sent on 11/16/2022, answer due 1/17/2023. (Junge, Gary)
November 16, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 9, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc. on 11/9/2022. (vfm)
November 9, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (vfm)
November 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4001666.) - filed by Jennifer L. Massotti. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (vfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massotti v. Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Massotti
Represented By: Gary E. Junge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?