Pennsylvania Manufacturers Indemnity Company v. Six Continents Hotels, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pennsylvania Manufacturers Indemnity Company
Defendant: Six Continents Hotels, Inc. and Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv01603
Filed: December 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2023 Filing 9 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss, to Decline Jurisdiction Over This Declaratory Judgment Action or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue, filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Certificate of Service)(Wasson, Jennifer) Modified on 2/8/2023 (nms).
February 8, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss, to Decline Jurisdiction Over This Declaratory Judgment Action or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue - filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Wasson, Jennifer) Modified on 2/8/2023 (nms).
January 20, 2023 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent InterContinental Hotel Group PLC for Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Wasson, Jennifer)
January 18, 2023 DEFICIENCY NOTICE issued by the Court to defendants Six Continents Hotels, Inc. and Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (b)(1), A party must: (1) file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Counsel for defendants is requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (nms)
January 10, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew W. Miller and Amanda M. Leffler - filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Wasson, Jennifer)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew W. Miller and Amanda M. Leffler, filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/10/2023. (nms)
January 6, 2023 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to February 8, 2023 - filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Wasson, Jennifer)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC answer due 2/8/2023; Six Continents Hotels, Inc. answer due 2/8/2023). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/6/2023. (nms)
December 21, 2022 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 19, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed, by Pennsylvania Manufacturers Indemnity Company. Defendants Answers due by 1/9/2023. (Doherty, Dawn) Modified on 12/21/2022 (nms).
December 16, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC on 12/16/2022; Six Continents Hotels, Inc. on 12/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued)(mpb)
December 16, 2022 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
December 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4027428.) - filed by Pennsylvania Manufacturers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennsylvania Manufacturers Indemnity Company v. Six Continents Hotels, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennsylvania Manufacturers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Dawn C. Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Continents Hotels, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Catherine Wasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Catherine Wasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?