Mcloughlin et al v. Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Mcloughlin Shawn, Miller Robert, Sofocleus Angelo, Lewis Andrew, Bunnett Cheyne, Robertshaw Tom, Scott Olivia, Shawn McLoughlin, Robert Miller, Angelo Sofocleus, Andrew Lewis, Cheyne Bunnett, Tom Robertshaw and Olivia Scott
Defendant: Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., BGC Holdings, L.P. and Newmark Holdings, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00256
Filed: March 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1337 Sherman-Clayton Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2023 Filing 17 STIPULATION Regarding Motion to Dismiss Briefing by BGC Holdings, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Newmark Holdings, L.P.. (Vrana, Robert)
May 3, 2023 Filing 16 STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES (nmf)
May 2, 2023 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Eric G. Hoffman, Mitchell Nobel, Benjamin R. Nagin, David A. Paul and Tacy F. Flint for BGC Holdings, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P. and Newmark Holdings, L.P. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
May 1, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Benjamin R. Nagin, Eric G. Hoffman, Tacy F. Flint, David Paul and Mitchell Nobel, filed by Newmark Holdings, L.P., BGC Holdings, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/1/2023. (nms)
April 28, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Benjamin R. Nagin, Eric G. Hoffman, Tacy F. Flint, David Paul and Mitchell Nobel - filed by BGC Holdings, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Newmark Holdings, L.P.. (Gaza, Anne)
April 28, 2023 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Newmark Group, Inc. for Newmark Holdings, L.P.; Corporate Parent BGC Partners, Inc. for BGC Holdings, L.P.; Other Affiliate CF Group Management, Inc. for Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P. filed by BGC Holdings, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Newmark Holdings, L.P.. (Gaza, Anne)
April 28, 2023 Filing 13 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Robert M. Vrana re #11 MOTION to Dismiss, by BGC Holdings, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Newmark Holdings, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Gaza, Anne) Modified on 4/28/2023 (nms).
April 28, 2023 Filing 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by BGC Holdings, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Newmark Holdings, L.P..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/12/2023. (Gaza, Anne) Modified on 5/1/2023 (nms).
April 28, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by BGC Holdings, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Newmark Holdings, L.P.. (Gaza, Anne) Modified on 5/1/2023 (nms).
April 28, 2023 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Lori Pennay re #9 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, by BGC Holdings, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Newmark Holdings, L.P.. (Gaza, Anne) Modified on 4/28/2023 (nms).
April 28, 2023 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - filed by BGC Holdings, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Newmark Holdings, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gaza, Anne) Modified on 4/28/2023 (nms).
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SO ORDERED as modified re #7 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Schedule of Proceedings (*Reset Answer Deadlines: BGC Holdings, L.P. answer due 4/28/2023; Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P. answer due 4/28/2023; Newmark Holdings, L.P. answer due 4/28/2023) (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/29/2023. (nms)
March 30, 2023 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kyle Roche for Cheyne Bunnett, Andrew Lewis, Shawn McLoughlin, Robert Miller, Tom Robertshaw, Olivia Scott, and Angelo Sofocleus added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mkr)
March 29, 2023 Filing 7 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Schedule of Proceedings, by Cheyne Bunnett, Andrew Lewis, Shawn McLoughlin, Robert Miller, Tom Robertshaw, Olivia Scott, Angelo Sofocleus. (Bennett, Blake) Modified on 3/29/2023 (nms).
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kyle W. Roche, filed by Cheyne Bunnett, Andrew Lewis, Olivia Scott, Tom Robertshaw, Shawn McLoughlin, Angelo Sofocleus, Robert Miller. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/15/2023. (nms)
March 15, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
March 13, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kyle W. Roche - filed by Cheyne Bunnett, Andrew Lewis, Shawn McLoughlin, Robert Miller, Tom Robertshaw, Olivia Scott, Angelo Sofocleus. (Bennett, Blake)
March 10, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tom Robertshaw, Robert Miller, Shawn McLoughlin, Cheyne Bunnett, Olivia Scott, Andrew Lewis, Angelo Sofocleus.BGC Holdings, L.P. served on 3/10/2023, answer due 3/31/2023. (Bennett, Blake)
March 10, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tom Robertshaw, Robert Miller, Shawn McLoughlin, Cheyne Bunnett, Olivia Scott, Andrew Lewis, Angelo Sofocleus.Newmark Holdings, L.P. served on 3/10/2023, answer due 3/31/2023. (Bennett, Blake)
March 10, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tom Robertshaw, Robert Miller, Shawn McLoughlin, Cheyne Bunnett, Olivia Scott, Andrew Lewis, Angelo Sofocleus.Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P. served on 3/10/2023, answer due 3/31/2023. (Bennett, Blake)
March 9, 2023 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm)
March 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against BGC Holdings, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Newmark Holdings, L.P. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4085709.) - filed by Tom Robertshaw, Robert Miller, Andrew Lewis, Cheyne Bunnett, Shawn Mcloughlin, Olivia Scott, Angelo Sofocleus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jfm).
March 9, 2023 No Summons Issued. (jfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mcloughlin et al v. Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mcloughlin Shawn
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miller Robert
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sofocleus Angelo
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Andrew
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bunnett Cheyne
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robertshaw Tom
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Olivia
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn McLoughlin
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Represented By: Kyle Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Miller
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Represented By: Kyle Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Sofocleus
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Represented By: Kyle Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Lewis
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Represented By: Kyle Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheyne Bunnett
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Represented By: Kyle Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Robertshaw
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Represented By: Kyle Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Scott
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Represented By: Kyle Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P.
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Benjamin R. Nagin
Represented By: David A. Paul
Represented By: Eric G. Hoffman
Represented By: Mitchell Nobel
Represented By: Tacy F. Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BGC Holdings, L.P.
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Benjamin R. Nagin
Represented By: David A. Paul
Represented By: Eric G. Hoffman
Represented By: Mitchell Nobel
Represented By: Tacy F. Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newmark Holdings, L.P.
Represented By: Anne Shea Gaza
Represented By: Benjamin R. Nagin
Represented By: David A. Paul
Represented By: Eric G. Hoffman
Represented By: Mitchell Nobel
Represented By: Tacy F. Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?