Vilox Technologies, LLC, et al v. Oracle Corporation
Plaintiff: Vilox Technologies, LLC, Vilox, LLC and Joseph L. De Bellis
Defendant: Oracle Corporation
Case Number: 1:2023cv00302
Filed: March 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2023 Remark - Pursuant to D.I. 66, D.I. 23, 32, and 56 have been unsealed. (dlw)
August 24, 2023 Filing 66 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Brian P. Egan regarding request to unseal documents. (Egan, Brian)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is scheduled for September 25, 2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jennifer L. Hall to discuss ADR. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call to chambers. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 8/14/2023. ***Copy emailed to: wramey@rameyfirm.com; LitParalegals@rameyfirm.com; litattorneys@rameyfirm.com; josephdebellis@gmail.com 8/15/2023*** Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00126-MN, 1:23-cv-00302-MN (ceg) Modified on 8/15/2023 (ceg).
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORAL ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Jennifer L. Hall for Mediation - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that these matters are referred to Judge Jennifer L. Hall for mediation. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 8/7/2023. ***Copy emailed to: wramey@rameyfirm.com; LitParalegals@rameyfirm.com; litattorneys@rameyfirm.com; josephdebellis@gmail.com 8/7/2023*** (dlw)
July 27, 2023 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text of the 7/27/2023 minute entry has been corrected to reflect that the motion to dismiss was granted and the complaint dismissed without prejudice. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00302-MN, 1:23-cv-00126-MN(mdb)
July 27, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maryellen Noreika - Motion Hearing held on 7/27/2023 re pending motions. The Motion to Intervene and Substitute is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART; Dr. De Bellis may join C.A. No. 23-302, but Vilox Technologies LLC will remain in the case. Vilox LLC is terminated. The Motion to Withdraw as Counsel is DENIED, but may be renewed at a later time if appropriate. The Motion to Dismiss in 23-302-MN is GRANTED and the complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice; plaintiffs are given leave to amend the complaint within 45 days. These cases are referred to the Magistrate Judge for exploring ADR. The transcript shall serve as the Court's order. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins.) Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00126-MN, 1:23-cv-00302-MN(mdb) Modified on 7/27/2023 (mdb).
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING (31 in case 1:23-cv-00126-MN; 62 in case 1:23-cv-00302-MN) MOTION for Exemption of Person from the District of Delaware's May 15, 2023 Standing Order on Personal Devices. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/25/2023. (dlw)
July 25, 2023 Filing 62 MOTION for Exemption of Person from the District of Delaware's May 15, 2023 Standing Order on Personal Devices - filed by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORAL ORDER DENYING (28) Motion to Continue in case 1:23-cv-00126-MN, (59) Motion to Continue in case 1:23-cv-00302-MN - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions are DENIED. The hearing shall take place as scheduled. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/20/2023. ***Copy emailed to: wramey@rameyfirm.com; LitParalegals@rameyfirm.com; litattorneys@rameyfirm.com; josephdebellis@gmail.com 7/20/2023*** (dlw)
July 19, 2023 Filing 60 RESPONSE to Motion re #59 MOTION to Continue filed by Oracle Corporation. (Egan, Brian) Modified on 7/20/2023 (dlw).
July 19, 2023 Filing 59 MOTION to Continue Hearing set for 7/27/2023 filed by Vilox Technologies' CEO, Dr. Joseph L. De Bellis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(jdb)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORAL ORDER Setting Hearing on (16 in 1:23-cv-00126-MN) MOTION for William P. Ramey, III to Withdraw as Attorney, (22 in 1:23-cv-00126-MN) MOTION to Intervene, (46 in 1:23-cv-00302-MN) MOTION for William P. Ramey, III to Withdraw as Attorney, (53 in 1:23-cv-00302-MN) MOTION to Intervene, (21 in 1:23-cv-00302-MN) MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(1) AND 12(B)(6) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Motion Hearing is set for 7/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Maryellen Noreika. The Court is setting aside 40 minutes for the hearing with the time split equally between the parties. Any slide presentations the parties wish to use shall be emailed (in PDF format) to MN_Civil@ded.uscourts.gov no later than 24 hours prior to the hearing with hard copies delivered to the Clerk's Office within one (1) hour thereafter. Counsel may, however, agree upon a different time to exchange their respective slides. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that William P. Ramey, III and Joseph L. DeBellis, M.D. shall appear in Court for these proceedings. ***Copy emailed to: wramey@rameyfirm.com; LitParalegals@rameyfirm.com; litattorneys@rameyfirm.com 7/10/2023*** ***Copy mailed to Dr. DeBellis, 282 Edge of Woods Road, Southampton, NY 11968 7/10/2023*** ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/10/2023. (dlw)
June 20, 2023 Filing 57 REDACTED VERSION of #56 Response to Motion by Oracle Corporation. (Egan, Brian)
June 13, 2023 Filing 56 RESPONSE to Motion re #53 MOTION to Intervene and Substitute filed by Oracle Corporation. (Egan, Brian) Modified on 8/25/2023 (dlw). ***UNSEALED Pursuant to D.I. #66 ***
June 2, 2023 Filing 55 Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Brian P. Egan regarding Standing Order - re (52 in 1:23-cv-00302-MN, 21 in 1:23-cv-00126-MN) Oral Order,,,,. (Egan, Brian)
May 30, 2023 Filing 54 OPENING BRIEF in Support of D.I. #53 MOTION to Intervene and Opposed MOTION to Substitute Plaintiff/Defendant filed by Vilox Technologies, LLC, Vilox, LLC. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(smg)
May 30, 2023 Filing 53 MOTION to Intervene and Opposed MOTION to Substitute Plaintiff/Defendant - filed by Vilox Technologies, LLC, Vilox, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(smg)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORAL ORDER - On 5/25/2023, the Court issued an Oral Order stating in part that "[t]he Court will not...accept further ex parte emails." Nevertheless, on 5/30/2023, the Court received an ex parte email stating: "We are not attempting to have an ex parte communication entered into the files. By the attached letter, we are attempting to comply with this Court's orders. Will you please provide the Honorable Judge Noreika the attached letter." The Court does not accept ex parte communications. The Court notes, however, that the referenced "attached letter" states that the patents-in-suit are "no longer owned by Vilox Technologies LLC or Vilox LLC" and those companies "no longer [have] standing." In light of counsel's representation, it appears that this Court does not have subject matter jurisdiction over these matters. On or before 6/2/2023, Oracle Corporation shall submit to the Court a letter addressing the standing issue. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/30/2023. ***Copy emailed to: wramey@rameyfirm.com; LitParalegals@rameyfirm.com; litattorneys@rameyfirm.com 5/30/2023*** (dlw)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORAL ORDER - On 5/15/2023, in C.A. No. 23-302 (MN), Vilox was ordered (for the third time) to obtain local counsel on or before 5/30/2023. Today, the Court received an ex parte email in C.A. No. 23-126 (MN) and in 23-302 (MN), requesting the Court docket filings because Vilox "still does not have local Delaware counsel." The Court will not docket the filings and will not accept further ex parte emails. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/25/2023. ***Copy emailed to: wramey@rameyfirm.com; LitParalegals@rameyfirm.com; litattorneys@rameyfirm.com 5/25/2023*** (dlw)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORAL ORDER re #47 MOTION to Stay - Plaintiffs' motion to stay #47 was filed by Vilox Technologies' CEO, Dr. Joseph L. DeBillis, an individual who does not appear to be a licensed attorney. (See D.I. 47 & 48). Corporations may appear in federal court only through licensed counsel. See Rowland v. California Mens Colony, Unit II Mens Advisory Council, 506 U.S. 194, 201-02 (1993). THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to stay #47 is STRICKEN. Additionally, Plaintiffs have yet to obtain Delaware counsel despite being notified of the requirement to do so on March 20, 2023 and again on April 28, 2023. IT IS THEREFORE FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before May 30, 2023, Plaintiffs shall obtain Delaware counsel and notify the Court. Failure to do so may result in sanctions, including but not limited to, dismissal of the action for failure to prosecute. Plaintiffs' counsel from Ramey LLP shall provide a copy of this oral order to their clients Vilox Technologies, LLC and Vilox, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/15/2023. ***Copy emailed to: wramey@rameyfirm.com; LitParalegals@rameyfirm.com; litattorneys@rameyfirm.com 5/15/2023*** (dlw)
May 5, 2023 Filing 49 STATUS REPORT - Response to April 28, 2023 Oral Order for Status Report on Efforts to Obtain Local Counsel - by Vilox Technologies, LLC, Vilox, LLC. (dlw)
May 5, 2023 Filing 48 Letter to Judge Noreika from Joesph L. DeBellis, CEO of Vilox Technologies, LLC in support of D.I. #47 Motion to Stay Proceeding. (vfm)
May 5, 2023 Filing 47 Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay Proceedings. - filed by Vilox Technologies, LLC. (vfm)
May 5, 2023 Filing 46 RENEWED MOTION for Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Attorney - filed by Vilox Technologies, LLC, Vilox, LLC. (dlw)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORAL ORDER re #44 The Opposed Motion for Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Attorney is DENIED with leave to renew. The motion purports to be made "in accordance with Local Rule 9010-2 b, effective May 28, 2023" which is not a rule of this Court. The motion also does not contain the required statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1. Should counsel refile the motion, it should indicate how counsel has served the motion on all parties rather than certify that it has been served via ECF when counsel had not actually filed the motion on the docket. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/3/2023. (dlw)
May 3, 2023 Filing 44 OPPOSED MOTION for Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Attorney - filed by Vilox Technologies, LLC, Vilox, LLC. (dlw)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORAL ORDER - As the deadline has passed for Plaintiff to obtain local counsel (see D.I. #34 ) and no local counsel having appeared for Plaintiffs, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before 5/5/2023, Plaintiff shall submit a status report as to their efforts to obtain local counsel. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/28/2023. ***Copy emailed to wramey@rameyfirm.com; LitParalegals@rameyfirm.com; litattorneys@rameyfirm.com 4/28/2023*** (dlw)
April 25, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Pending Matters by Oracle Corporation re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 4/25/2023 (dlw).
April 19, 2023 Filing 41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jared Bobrow, Diana M. Rutowski, Jason Yu and Kristina D. McKenna - filed by Oracle Corporation. (Egan, Brian)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #41 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jared Bobrow, Diana M. Rutowski, Jason Yu and Kristina D. McKenna filed by Oracle Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/19/2023. (dlw)
April 18, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Melissa R. Smith and the law firm Gillam & Smith LLP as co-counsel.. (Egan, Brian)
April 18, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Egan on behalf of Oracle Corporation (Egan, Brian)
April 12, 2023 Filing 38 DECLARATION re 37 Oral Order // Declaration of Diana M. Rutowski in Support of Redacted Versions of Defendant's Motion to Transfer and Related Documents (D.I. 20, 23, and 32) by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 4/12/2023 (dlw).
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORAL ORDER re #20 Unopposed Motion to Seal; #23 Defendant's Opposed Motion to Transfer; #32 Order Granting Transfer - Having reviewed the docket in this matter, there are three (3) docket items (D.I. 20, 23, 32) that were filed UNDER SEAL prior to the transfer to the District of Delaware. Redacted versions were not filed. The Third Circuit has held that "there is a presumptive right of public access to pretrial motions of a non-discovery nature, whether preliminary or dispositive." This common law presumption is not absolute, and may be overcome by a showing that the "interest in secrecy" outweighs the "presumptive right of public access." This may be achieved by demonstrating that disclosure of the material will work a clearly defined, serious injury to the party seeking to keep documents under seal. A party must be able to articulate the compelling, countervailing interests to be protected; broad allegations of harm, bereft of specific examples or articulated reasons, will be insufficient to permit documents to remain confidential. In Re Avandia Mktg., Sales Practices and Prods. Liab. Litig., 924 F.3d 662 (3d Cir. 2019). The unopposed motion to seal (D.I. 20) does not set forth any cause for the requested sealing of the documents. THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, on or before 4/12/2023, the parties shall either advise the Court that it can un-seal the sealed filings or, if the parties are seeking redactions (pursuant to the Administrative Procedures Governing Filing and Service of Electronic Means for the District of Delaware, "redacted version[s] of [] sealed civil document[s] shall be filed electronically, within 7 days after the filing of the original sealed document") they shall file with any proposed redactions a declaration setting forth the good case established by the Third Circuit for each redaction individually. If any party has not obtained local counsel, or local counsel has not entered their appearance by 4/12/2023, that party may submit the letter advising the Court the documents may be unsealed or the proposed redacted versions with supporting declarations for docketing to diana_welham@ded.uscourts.gov. Failure to comply with this Oral Order will result in the documents being unsealed in their entirety. ***Oral Order emailed to counsel (MNAT, Orrick Herrington, Ramey, and Gillam and Smith) 4/5/2023*** ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/5/2023. (dlw)
April 3, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 31, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Related Actions by Oracle Corporation (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 23, 2023 Filing 35 STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES (nmf)
March 22, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 20, 2023 Filing 34 Local Counsel Letter sent on 3/20/2023. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 4/19/2023. (jfm)
March 20, 2023 Filing 33 Record of case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number in Other District: 6:22-cv-01254. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Sealed Order GRANTING #23 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE AND FURTHER ORDERS OF THE COURT. Motion #25 is denied, Motion #21 is deferred to receiving Court. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
March 6, 2023 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Oracle Corporation, re #21 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(1) AND 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant Oracle Corporation (Smith, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
March 1, 2023 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Oracle Corporation, re #25 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Venue Discovery filed by Plaintiff Vilox, LLC, Plaintiff Vilox Technologies, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)[Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
March 1, 2023 Filing 29 RESPONSE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Oracle Corporation. (Smith, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
March 1, 2023 Filing 28 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Vilox Technologies, LLC, re #21 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(1) AND 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant Oracle Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramey, William) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
February 27, 2023 Filing 27 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #26 Response in Opposition to Motion, (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
February 27, 2023 Filing 26 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Vilox Technologies, LLC, Vilox, LLC, re #21 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(1) AND 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant Oracle Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ramey, William) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
February 27, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Venue Discovery by Vilox Technologies, LLC, Vilox, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramey, William) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER FOR SCHEDULING RECOMMENDATIONS AND ADVISORY CONCERNING ASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
February 13, 2023 Filing 23 Sealed Motion filed: Defendant's Opposed Motion to Transfer (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF DIANA M. RUTOWSKI, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Clerk's Office will file the requested document under seal. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
February 13, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(1) AND 12(B)(6) by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit D. Rutowski, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
February 10, 2023 Filing 20 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Proposed Order) (Smith, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kristina DiBenedetto McKenna for Oracle Corporation. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (ad3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
February 8, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith for K. McKenna ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17057364) by on behalf of Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason K. Yu for Oracle Corporation. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (ad3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Diana Rutowski for Oracle Corporation. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
January 6, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith for Diana Rutowski ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16929869) by on behalf of Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
January 6, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith for Jason K. Yu ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16928413) by on behalf of Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jared Bobrow for Oracle Corporation. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (ad3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
December 27, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa Richards Smith (Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jared Bobrow) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-16899360) by on behalf of Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT ; Oracle Corporation answer due 2/11/2023. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (bw) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
December 22, 2022 Filing 10 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Oracle Corporation. (Smith, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
December 22, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
December 22, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Oracle Corporation. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith added to party Oracle Corporation(pty:dft) (Smith, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
December 9, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vilox Technologies, LLC. Oracle Corporation served on 12/7/2022, answer due 12/28/2022. (Ramey, William) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
December 6, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Oracle Corporation. (lad) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE Notice of Related Cases by Vilox Technologies, LLC and Vilox, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramey, William) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Parties by Vilox Technologies, LLC and Vilox, LLC. (Ramey, William) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Vilox Technologies, LLC and Vilox, LLC. (Ramey, William) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16817766), filed by Vilox Technologies, LLC and Vilox, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) [Transferred from Texas Western on 3/20/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vilox Technologies, LLC, et al v. Oracle Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vilox Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vilox, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph L. De Bellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oracle Corporation
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Brian P. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?