Talley et al v. Horn et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Talley, Janice A. Talley and Kristina Karen Talley
Defendant: Judith C. Horn, Darren W. Horn, Sr., Darren W. Horn, Jr., Kevin R. Talley, Court of Chancery of The State of Delaware, Patricia W. Griffin, Superior Court of the State of Delaware, Judge Mark H. Conner, Community Legal Aid Society, Inc., Olga Beskrone, Sergovic Carmean Weidman McCartney & Owens, P.A., David Weidman and Rob Book
Case Number: 1:2023cv00324
Filed: March 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter and Failure to State a Claim - filed by Rob Book. (Dunkle, Kyle) Modified on 5/18/2023 (dlw).
May 17, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle F. Dunkle on behalf of Rob Book (Dunkle, Kyle)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORAL ORDER re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall have until 6/9/2023 to file responses to the #14 Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/10/2023. (dlw) ***Copy mailed to each Pro Se Plaintiff 5/10/2023***
May 9, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to #14 Motion to Dismiss - filed by Janice A. Talley, Kenneth R. Talley, Kristina Karen Talley. (twk)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORAL ORDER GRANTING #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss, #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss, #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall have until 5/30/2023 to file responses to the Motions to Dismiss (D.I. 8, 9, 10). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/27/2023. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiffs 4/27/2023*** (dlw)
April 20, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in opposition to D.I. #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by Janice A. Talley, Kenneth R. Talley, Kristina Karen Talley. (vfm)
April 20, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in opposition to D.I. #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by Janice A. Talley, Kenneth R. Talley, Kristina Karen Talley. (vfm)
April 20, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in opposition to D.I. #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by Janice A. Talley, Kenneth R. Talley, Kristina Karen Talley. (vfm)
April 19, 2023 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter filed by Mark H. Conner, Court of Chancery of The State of Delaware, Patricia W. Griffin, Superior Court of the State of Delaware.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Radinson-Blasucci, Caneel)
April 19, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by Mark H. Conner, Court of Chancery of The State of Delaware, Patricia W. Griffin, Superior Court of the State of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Radinson-Blasucci, Caneel)
April 14, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Caneel Radinson-Blasucci on behalf of Superior Court of the State of Delaware (Radinson-Blasucci, Caneel)
April 6, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark H. Conner, Court of Chancery of The State of Delaware, Patricia W. Griffin re #11 Notice of Appearance (Radinson-Blasucci, Caneel)
April 6, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Caneel Radinson-Blasucci on behalf of Mark H. Conner, Court of Chancery of The State of Delaware, Patricia W. Griffin (Radinson-Blasucci, Caneel)
March 30, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by David Weidman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-9, #2 Proposed Order for Motion to Dismiss, #3 Certificate of Service)(Friedman, Tyler)
March 30, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by Sergovic Carmean Weidman McCartney & Owens, P.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-9, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Friedman, Tyler) Modified on 3/30/2023 (dlw).
March 30, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Over the Subject Matter - filed by Judith C. Horn, Darren W. Horn, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-9, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Friedman, Tyler) Modified on 3/30/2023 (dlw).
March 30, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Friedman on behalf of Sergovic Carmean Weidman McCartney & Owens, P.A. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Friedman, Tyler) Modified on 3/30/2023 (dlw).
March 30, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Friedman on behalf of Judith C. Horn (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Friedman, Tyler) Modified on 3/30/2023 (dlw).
March 30, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Friedman on behalf of Darren W. Horn, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Friedman, Tyler) Modified on 3/30/2023 (dlw).
March 29, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
March 23, 2023 Filing 4 MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT filed by Janice A. Talley, Kenneth R. Talley, and Kristina Karen Talley in the form of a USB Drive. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). (nmg)
March 23, 2023 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk)
March 23, 2023 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
March 23, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against Olga Beskrone, Rob Book, Community Legal Aid Society, Inc., Mark H. Conner, Court of Chancery of The State of Delaware, Patricia W. Griffin, Judith C. Horn, Darren W. Horn, Jr., Darren W. Horn, Sr., Sergovic Carmean Weidman McCartney & Owens, P.A., Superior Court of the State of Delaware, Kevin R. Talley, David Weidman ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 907.) - filed by Janice A. Talley, Kenneth R. Talley, Kristina Karen Talley. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Acknowledgement of Consent Form, #9 Acknowledgement of Rule 4, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talley et al v. Horn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice A. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Karen Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith C. Horn
Represented By: Tyler Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren W. Horn, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren W. Horn, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin R. Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Court of Chancery of The State of Delaware
Represented By: Caneel Radinson-Blasucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia W. Griffin
Represented By: Caneel Radinson-Blasucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of the State of Delaware
Represented By: Caneel Radinson-Blasucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Mark H. Conner
Represented By: Caneel Radinson-Blasucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Legal Aid Society, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olga Beskrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergovic Carmean Weidman McCartney & Owens, P.A.
Represented By: Tyler Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Weidman
Represented By: Tyler Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Book
Represented By: Kyle F. Dunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?