Ramsey Asset Management, LLC v. The Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ramsey Asset Management, LLC
Defendant: The Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv00453
Filed: April 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Letter to The Hon. Colm F. Connolly from R. Grant Dick IV regarding courtesy copies of Defendant's Reply Brief In Support of Motion To Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) - re #19 Reply Brief,. (Dick, Robert)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) filed by The Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Dick, Robert)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Daly - filed by The Standard Insurance Company. (Dick, Robert)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Daly, filed by The Standard Insurance Company. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/1/2023. (kmd)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brooks R. Magratten, filed by The Standard Insurance Company. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/30/2023. (kmd)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brooks R. Magratten - filed by The Standard Insurance Company. (Dick, Robert)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) filed by Ramsey Asset Management, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance with typeface requirement and type-volume limitation)(Landon, Roger)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Letter to The Hon. Colm F. Connolly from R. Grant Dick IV regarding courtesy copies of the Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue - re #13 Response to Motion,. (Dick, Robert)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued to Ramsey Asset Management, LLC re #9 OPPOSITION to Motion to Change Venue. Pursuant to the Court's Standing Order Regarding Briefing in All Cases, dated November 10, 2022, "[t]he covers of briefs filed in connection with all motions except for motions in limine included in a pretrial order shall be as follows: i. Opening Brief Blue; ii. Answering Brief Red; iii. Reply Brief Gray." Courtesy copies of D.I. #9 are not in compliance with the Court's standing order. Please resubmit courtesy copies of your brief with the corrected covers. (kmd)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Change Venue PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION (Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue) filed by The Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Dick, Robert) (Main Document 13 replaced on 5/16/2023) (jdb).
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Main document to D.I. #13 replaced with a clean version of the document per counsel's request. (jdb)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Letter to The Hon. Colm F. Connolly from R. Grant Dick IV regarding courtesy copies of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Opening Brief - re #11 Opening Brief in Support, #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)). (Dick, Robert)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) filed by The Standard Insurance Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Compliance)(Dick, Robert)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) - filed by The Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dick, Robert)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Change Venue PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION - filed by Ramsey Asset Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Landon, Roger) Modified on 5/17/2023 (kmd).
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES (nmf)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of R. Grant Dick IV re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia Averment of Counsel Pursuant to D. Del. Loc. R. 7.1.1 filed by The Standard Insurance Company. (Dick, Robert)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia - filed by The Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Dick, Robert)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer, move or otherwise respond to Complaint to May 11, 2023 - filed by The Standard Insurance Company. (Dick, Robert)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer, move or otherwise respond to Complaint to May 11, 2023, filed by The Standard Insurance Company. Reset Answer Deadlines: The Standard Insurance Company answer due 5/11/2023. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/26/2023. (kmd)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent StanCorp Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Meiji Yasuda Life Insurance Company for The Standard Insurance Company filed by The Standard Insurance Company. (Dick, Robert)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Ramsey Asset Management, LLC. (Landon, Roger)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N23C-03-104 EMD (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-4120044)- filed by The Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2023: #4 Certificate of Service) (mpb).
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order DEFICIENCY NOTICE issued by the Court to Plaintiff: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (b)(1), A party must: (1) file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Counsel is requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (mpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramsey Asset Management, LLC v. The Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramsey Asset Management, LLC
Represented By: Roger D. Landon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Grant Dick, IV
Represented By: James W. Semple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?