Cornelious v. MacNamara et al
Plaintiff: Ivin Cornelious
Defendant: Detective MacNamara, Detective Phelps, Detective James Wiggins, Unknown Officers and The City of Wilmington Delaware
Case Number: 1:2023cv00659
Filed: June 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Gregory B Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosamaria Tassone-DiNardo on behalf of MacNamara, The City of Wilmington Delaware, Unknown Officers, James Wiggins (Tassone-DiNardo, Rosamaria)
August 4, 2023 Filing 12 Return of Undeliverable Mail of Copy of Rule 4, Summons, and Acknowledgement of Receipt of Consent Form sent to Ivin Cornelious. Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward. (mpb)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph S. Oxman filed by Ivin Cornelious. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 8/1/23. (ntl)
July 27, 2023 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Ivin Cornelious. Unknown Officers served on 6/30/2023, answer due 7/21/2023. (Mondros, Herbert)
July 27, 2023 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Ivin Cornelious. James Wiggins served on 6/30/2023, answer due 7/21/2023. (Mondros, Herbert)
July 27, 2023 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Ivin Cornelious. Phelps served on 6/30/2023, answer due 7/21/2023. (Mondros, Herbert)
July 27, 2023 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Ivin Cornelious. MacNamara served on 6/30/2023, answer due 7/21/2023. (Mondros, Herbert)
July 27, 2023 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Ivin Cornelious. The City of Wilmington Delaware served on 6/30/2023, answer due 7/21/2023. (Mondros, Herbert)
July 18, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph S. Oxman - filed by Ivin Cornelious. (Mondros, Herbert)
July 18, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Herbert W. Mondros on behalf of Ivin Cornelious (Mondros, Herbert)
July 3, 2023 Filing 4 Return of Undeliverable Mail containing the case assignment sent to Irvin Cornelious on 6/21/2023. Reason for return: insufficient address, unable to forward. (mkr)
June 21, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 15, 2023 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk)
June 15, 2023 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
June 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against Detective MacNamara, Detective Phelps, The City of Wilmington Delaware, Unknown Officers, Detective James Wiggins ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 1196.) - filed by Ivin Cornelious. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)
June 15, 2023 Remark: Copy of Rule 4, Summons, and Acknowledgement of Receipt of Consent Form mailed to Plaintiff (apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornelious v. MacNamara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivin Cornelious
Represented By: Herbert W. Mondros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective MacNamara
Represented By: Rosamaria Tassone-DiNardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective James Wiggins
Represented By: Rosamaria Tassone-DiNardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Officers
Represented By: Rosamaria Tassone-DiNardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Wilmington Delaware
Represented By: Rosamaria Tassone-DiNardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?