Soteropoulos et al v. Round Finance Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dean Soteropoulos and Prem Tadipatri
Defendant: Round Finance Inc., Anshum Bhambri, Kushagra Kohli, Vishal Vasudeva, Fancraze Technologies Inc., Sundar Raman and Fancraze Software Pvt. Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00678
Filed: June 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dean Soteropoulos, Prem Tadipatri.Fancraze Software Pvt. Ltd. served on 6/29/2023, answer due 7/20/2023. (Hitch, Cortlan)
July 10, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dean Soteropoulos, Prem Tadipatri.Sundar Raman served on 6/29/2023, answer due 7/20/2023. (Hitch, Cortlan)
July 10, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dean Soteropoulos, Prem Tadipatri.Fancraze Technologies Inc. served on 6/29/2023, answer due 7/20/2023. (Hitch, Cortlan)
July 10, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dean Soteropoulos, Prem Tadipatri.Vishal Vasudeva served on 6/29/2023, answer due 7/20/2023. (Hitch, Cortlan)
July 10, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dean Soteropoulos, Prem Tadipatri.Kushagra Kohli served on 6/29/2023, answer due 7/20/2023. (Hitch, Cortlan)
July 10, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dean Soteropoulos, Prem Tadipatri.Anshum Bhambri served on 6/29/2023, answer due 7/20/2023. (Hitch, Cortlan)
July 10, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dean Soteropoulos, Prem Tadipatri.Round Finance Inc. served on 6/29/2023, answer due 7/20/2023. (Hitch, Cortlan)
June 30, 2023 Filing 8 REDACTED VERSION of #5 Exhibit to a Document Exhibits 1-45 to complaint by Dean Soteropoulos, Prem Tadipatri. (Hitch, Cortlan)
June 28, 2023 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES (nmf)
June 28, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORAL ORDER: The motion to seal complaint (D.I. #1 ) is GRANTED in Part and DENIED in Part. The motion to seal the exhibits to the Complaint is GRANTED, and the motion to seal the Complaint is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/23/2023. (nms)
June 23, 2023 Filing 5 [SEALED] Exhibits 1-45 to #2 Complaint, by Dean Soteropoulos, Prem Tadipatri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 19-33, #2 Exhibits 34-45)(nms)
June 23, 2023 Remark: Exit electronic copies to Duty Judge, RGA. (mkr)
June 23, 2023 Remark: Case submitted for routine Judicial Assignment. (mkr)
June 22, 2023 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Dean Soteropoulos and Prem Tadipatri. (mkr)
June 22, 2023 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mkr)
June 22, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Breach of Fiduciary Duty with Jury Demand against Anshum Bhambri, Fancraze Software Pvt. Ltd., Fancraze Technologies Inc., Kushagra Kohli, Sundar Raman, Round Finance Inc., and Vishal Vasudeva (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4164238) - filed by Dean Soteropoulos and Prem Tadipatri. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-18, # 2 Exhibits 19-33, # 3 Exhibits 34-45, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(mkr) Modified on 6/23/2023 (nms).
June 22, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION to Seal Complaint and Exhibits - filed by Dean Soteropoulos and Prem Tadipatri. (Attachments: #1 Prosed Order) (mkr)
June 22, 2023 No Summons Issued. (mkr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soteropoulos et al v. Round Finance Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Soteropoulos
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Cortlan S. Hitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prem Tadipatri
Represented By: Cortlan S. Hitch
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Round Finance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anshum Bhambri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kushagra Kohli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vishal Vasudeva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fancraze Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundar Raman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fancraze Software Pvt. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?