Woodfield v. Twitter, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Chris Woodfield
Defendant: Twitter, Inc., X Corp., X Holdings I, Inc., X Holdings Corp. and Elon Musk
Case Number: 1:2023cv00780
Filed: July 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2104 Worker Adjustment & Retraining Notification Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SO ORDERED, re #23 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration to September 28, 2023, filed by Chris Woodfield. Reset Briefing Schedule: re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, #20 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) to Dismiss Counts VI and IX and Alternative Motion to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Answering Brief due 9/28/2023. Reply Brief due 10/17/2023. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/11/2023. (kmd)
September 11, 2023 Filing 23 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration to September 28, 2023 - filed by Chris Woodfield. (Christensen, Joseph)
September 6, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Musk's Motion to Dismiss by Elon Musk re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) to Dismiss Counts VI and IX and Alternative Motion to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barillare, Jody)
September 6, 2023 Filing 21 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) to Dismiss Counts VI and IX and Alternative Motion to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Elon Musk.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Barillare, Jody)
September 6, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) to Dismiss Counts VI and IX and Alternative Motion to Dismiss Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) - filed by Elon Musk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barillare, Jody)
September 1, 2023 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Akiva M. Cohen,Lane A. Haygood,Michael Dunford,Dylan M. Schmeyer for Chris Woodfield added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk)
August 31, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael D. Dunford - filed by Chris Woodfield. (Christensen, Joseph)
August 31, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lane A. Haygood - filed by Chris Woodfield. (Christensen, Joseph)
August 31, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dylan Schmeyer - filed by Chris Woodfield. (Christensen, Joseph)
August 31, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Akiva Cohen - filed by Chris Woodfield. (Christensen, Joseph)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Dylan Schmeyer filed by Chris Woodfield, #18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lane A. Haygood filed by Chris Woodfield, #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Akiva Cohen filed by Chris Woodfield, #19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael D. Dunford filed by Chris Woodfield. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/31/2023. (nmf)
August 29, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric Meckley and T. Cullen Wallace - filed by Elon Musk, Twitter, Inc., X Corp., X Holdings Corp., X Holdings I, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Eric Meckley, #2 Certification of T. Cullen Wallace)(Barillare, Jody)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric Meckley and T. Cullen Wallace, filed by Elon Musk, X Holdings I, Inc., Twitter, Inc., X Holdings Corp., X Corp. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/29/2023. (kmd)
August 29, 2023 Pro Hac Vice Attorney T. Cullen Wallace and Eric Meckley for Elon Musk, Twitter, Inc., X Corp., X Holdings Corp., and X Holdings I, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mkr)
August 29, 2023 CORRECTING ENTRY: Exhibit 10 of D.I. #13 has been replaced with a redacted version per counsel's request. (kmd)
August 28, 2023 Filing 14 DECLARATION re #12 Opening Brief in Support, OF LAUREN WEGMAN by Twitter, Inc., X Corp., X Holdings Corp., X Holdings I, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barillare, Jody)
August 28, 2023 Filing 13 DECLARATION re #12 Opening Brief in Support, OF ERIC MECKLEY by Twitter, Inc., X Corp., X Holdings Corp., X Holdings I, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Barillare, Jody) (Attachment 10 replaced on 8/29/2023) (kmd).
August 28, 2023 Filing 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Twitter, Inc., X Corp., X Holdings Corp., X Holdings I, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Barillare, Jody)
August 28, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration - filed by Twitter, Inc., X Corp., X Holdings Corp., X Holdings I, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barillare, Jody)
August 25, 2023 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to September 6, 2023 for Defendant Elon Musk; remaining defendants August 28, 2023 - filed by Elon Musk, Twitter, Inc., X Corp., X Holdings Corp., X Holdings I, Inc.. (Barillare, Jody)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to September 6, 2023 for Defendant Elon Musk; remaining defendants August 28, 2023, filed by Elon Musk, X Holdings I, Inc., Twitter, Inc., X Holdings Corp., X Corp. Reset Answer Deadlines: Elon Musk answer due 9/6/2023. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/25/2023. (kmd)
August 7, 2023 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint and Waiver of Service to August 28, 2023 - filed by Elon Musk, Twitter, Inc., X Corp., X Holdings Corp., X Holdings I, Inc.. (Barillare, Jody)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint and Waiver of Service to August 28, 2023, filed by Elon Musk, X Holdings I, Inc., Twitter, Inc., X Holdings Corp., X Corp. Reset Answer Deadlines: Elon Musk answer due 8/28/2023; Twitter, Inc. answer due 8/28/2023; X Corp. answer due 8/28/2023; X Holdings Corp. answer due 8/28/2023; X Holdings I, Inc. answer due 8/28/2023. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/7/2023. (kmd)
August 3, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jody Barillare on behalf of All Defendants (Barillare, Jody)
July 26, 2023 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES (nmf)
July 26, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 25, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris Woodfield.X Holdings Corp. served on 7/25/2023, answer due 8/15/2023. (Christensen, Joseph)
July 25, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris Woodfield.X Corp. served on 7/25/2023, answer due 8/15/2023. (Christensen, Joseph)
July 20, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris Woodfield.X Holdings I, Inc. served on 7/19/2023, answer due 8/9/2023. (Christensen, Joseph)
July 20, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris Woodfield.Twitter, Inc. served on 7/19/2023, answer due 8/9/2023. (Christensen, Joseph)
July 18, 2023 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm)
July 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Elon Musk, Twitter, Inc., X Corp., X Holdings Corp., X Holdings I, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4181060.) - filed by Chris Woodfield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jfm)
July 18, 2023 No Summons Issued. (jfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodfield v. Twitter, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Woodfield
Represented By: Joseph Christensen
Represented By: Akiva M. Cohen
Represented By: Dylan M. Schmeyer
Represented By: Lane A. Haygood
Represented By: Michael Dunford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Represented By: Eric Meckley
Represented By: T. Cullen Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Corp.
Represented By: T. Cullen Wallace
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Represented By: Eric Meckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Holdings I, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Meckley
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Represented By: T. Cullen Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Represented By: Eric Meckley
Represented By: T. Cullen Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elon Musk
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Represented By: Eric Meckley
Represented By: T. Cullen Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?