N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Health and Welfare Fund et al v. KAM Electric, Inc.
Plaintiff: N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Health and Welfare Fund, N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Pension Fund, N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Deferred Income Plan, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 313 and I.B.E.W. Joint Apprenticeship & Training Center Fund N.E.C.A. Local Union 313
Defendant: KAM Electric, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00800
Filed: July 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Gregory B Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney W. Daniel Feehan - filed by I.B.E.W. Joint Apprenticeship & Training Center Fund N.E.C.A. Local Union 313, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 313, N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Deferred Income Plan, N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Health and Welfare Fund, N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certification of W. Daniel Feehan, Esq., #2 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Timothy)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney W. Daniel Feehan filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 313, N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Deferred Income Plan, N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Health and Welfare Fund, I.B.E.W. Joint Apprenticeship & Training Center Fund N.E.C.A. Local Union 313, N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Pension Fund. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 8/10/23. (ntl)
August 7, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Pension Fund, N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Health and Welfare Fund, N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Deferred Income Plan, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 313, I.B.E.W. Joint Apprenticeship & Training Center Fund N.E.C.A. Local Union 313.KAM Electric, Inc. served on 8/7/2023, answer due 8/28/2023. (Kinkus, Jennifer)
August 2, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 25, 2023 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
July 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against KAM Electric, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4186156.) - filed by N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Pension Fund, N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Health and Welfare Fund, N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Deferred Income Plan, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 313, I.B.E.W. Joint Apprenticeship & Training Center Fund N.E.C.A. Local Union 313, 814. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)
July 25, 2023 No Summons Issued. (apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Health and Welfare Fund et al v. KAM Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Kinkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Pension Fund
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Kinkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.E.C.A. Local Union No. 313 I.B.E.W. Deferred Income Plan
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Kinkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union No. 313
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Kinkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.B.E.W. Joint Apprenticeship & Training Center Fund N.E.C.A. Local Union 313
Represented By: Timothy J. Snyder
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Kinkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAM Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?