AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP v. Becerra et al
Plaintiff: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and AstraZeneca AB
Defendant: Xavier Becerra and Chiquita Brooks-LaSure
Case Number: 1:2023cv00931
Filed: August 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECLARATION re #19 Opening Brief in Support, of Marlan Golden by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Silver, Daniel)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Word Count Certification)(Silver, Daniel)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment - filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silver, Daniel)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure- filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Redline)(Silver, Daniel)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SO ORDERED, re #13 STIPULATION and Order Regarding Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. ORDER, Setting Hearings( An Oral Argument is set for 1/31/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly.) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/19/2023. (nmf)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Michael Pezzi on behalf of All Defendants (Pezzi, Stephen)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander V Sverdlov on behalf of All Defendants (Sverdlov, Alexander)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Catherine E. Stetson for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES (nmf)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Catherine E. Stetson, Susan M. Cook, and Marlan Golden - filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Certifications)(Silver, Daniel)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Marlan Golden for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (smg)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Susan M. Cook for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (smg)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Catherine E. Stetson, Susan M. Cook, and Marlan Golden, filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/30/2023. (kmd)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECLARATION of Service on David C. Weiss by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION of Service on Merrick B. Garland by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION of Service on Chiquita Brooks-LaSure by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLARATION of Service on Xavier Becerra by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION of Service on Samuel R. Bagenstos by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Joyce, Alexandra)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Xavier Becerra and Chiquita Brooks-LaSure on 8/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Chiquita Brooks-LaSure)(jfm)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (jfm)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-LaSure (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4209061.) - filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP v. Becerra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Catherine E. Stetson
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Marlan Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AstraZeneca AB
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Alexander V Sverdlov
Represented By: Stephen Michael Pezzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiquita Brooks-LaSure
Represented By: Alexander V Sverdlov
Represented By: Stephen Michael Pezzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?