Progress Rail Services Corporation et al v. Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Progress Rail Services Corporation and Progress Rail Locomotive Inc.
Defendant: Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation and Wabtec Railway Electronics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00983
Filed: September 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2023 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation for Wabtec Railway Electronics, Inc. filed by Wabtec Railway Electronics, Inc.. (Farnan, Kelly)
October 3, 2023 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation. (Farnan, Kelly)
September 27, 2023 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David C. Kiernan, Catherine T. Zeng, and Caroline O. Van Wagoner for Wabtec Railway Electronics, Inc. and Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SO ORDERED, re #13 Stipulation Regarding Briefing on Wabtec's Motion to Dismiss, filed by Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation, Wabtec Railway Electronics, Inc. Set Briefing Schedule: Opening Brief due 11/6/2023. Answering Brief due 12/8/2023. Reply Brief due 12/22/2023. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/26/2023. (kmd)
September 26, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David C. Kiernan, Catherine T. Zeng and Caroline O. Van Wagoner - filed by Wabtec Railway Electronics, Inc., Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation. (Farnan, Kelly)
September 26, 2023 Filing 13 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Briefing on Wabtec's Motion to Dismiss by Wabtec Railway Electronics, Inc., Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation. (Farnan, Kelly)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David C. Kiernan, Catherine T. Zeng and Caroline O. Van Wagoner, filed by Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation, Wabtec Railway Electronics, Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/26/2023. (kmd)
September 18, 2023 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Amy S. Manning, Angelo M. Russo, Joshua D. Wade, and Wrede H. Smith, III for Progress Rail Locomotive Inc. and Progress Rail Services Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
September 15, 2023 Filing 12 STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES (nmf)
September 13, 2023 Filing 11 REDACTED VERSION of #7 Exhibit to a Document Exhibits A-B to Complaint by Progress Rail Locomotive Inc., Progress Rail Services Corporation. (Choa, Jonathan)
September 13, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amy B. Manning, Angelo M. Russo, Wrede H. Smith, III and Joshua D. Wade filed by Progress Rail Locomotive Inc., Progress Rail Services Corporation. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/13/2023. (nmf)
September 7, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amy B. Manning, Angelo M. Russo, Wrede H. Smith, III and Joshua D. Wade - filed by Progress Rail Locomotive Inc., Progress Rail Services Corporation. (Choa, Jonathan)
September 7, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progress Rail Services Corporation, Progress Rail Locomotive Inc..Wabtec Railway Electronics, Inc. served on 9/7/2023, answer due 9/28/2023. (Choa, Jonathan)
September 7, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Progress Rail Services Corporation, Progress Rail Locomotive Inc..Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation served on 9/7/2023, answer due 9/28/2023. (Choa, Jonathan)
September 7, 2023 Filing 7 [SEALED] Exhibits A-B to #2 Complaint, by Progress Rail Locomotive Inc., Progress Rail Services Corporation. (nms)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORAL ORDER: The motion to seal complaint (D.I. #1 ) is DENIED as to the complaint, but granted as to Exhibits A & B. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/7/2023. (nms)
September 7, 2023 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Caterpillar Inc. for Progress Rail Locomotive Inc. filed by Progress Rail Locomotive Inc.. (Choa, Jonathan)
September 7, 2023 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Caterpillar Inc. for Progress Rail Services Corporation filed by Progress Rail Services Corporation. (Choa, Jonathan)
September 7, 2023 Remark: Case Submitted for Routine Judicial Assignment. (apk)
September 6, 2023 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
September 6, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Wabtec Railway Electronics, Inc., Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 1439) - filed by Progress Rail Services Corporation, Progress Rail Locomotive Inc. (Attachments: #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) Modified on 9/7/2023 (nms).
September 6, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint and Exhibits A-B Under Seal - filed by Progress Rail Locomotive Inc., Progress Rail Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(apk)
September 6, 2023 Remark: Exit Electronic Copies of Complaint, Motion to Seal, and Exhibits A-B to the Duty Judge (RGA) (apk)
September 6, 2023 DEFICIENCY NOTICE issued by the Court to Plaintiff: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (b)(1), A party must: (1) file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Counsel is requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (apk)
September 6, 2023 No Summons Issued. (apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progress Rail Services Corporation et al v. Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progress Rail Services Corporation
Represented By: Myron T. Steele
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Represented By: Matthew Foulger Davis
Represented By: Amy B. Manning
Represented By: Angelo M. Russo
Represented By: Joshua D. Wade
Represented By: Wrede H. Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progress Rail Locomotive Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan A. Choa
Represented By: Matthew Foulger Davis
Represented By: Myron T. Steele
Represented By: Amy B. Manning
Represented By: Angelo M. Russo
Represented By: Joshua D. Wade
Represented By: Wrede H. Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Air Brake Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Caroline O. Van Wagoner
Represented By: Catherine T. Zeng
Represented By: David C. Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wabtec Railway Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Caroline O. Van Wagoner
Represented By: Catherine T. Zeng
Represented By: David C. Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?