Humana Inc. v. Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Plaintiff: Humana Inc.
Defendant: Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv01006
Filed: September 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SO ORDERED, re (49 in 1:23-cv-01006-CFC, 45 in 1:23-cv-01004-CFC, 536 in 1:20-cv-01076-CFC) Stipulation Regarding Coordination of Related Cases, filed by Aetna Inc., Humana Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/27/2023. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01076-CFC, 1:23-cv-01004-CFC, 1:23-cv-01006-CFC (kmd)
October 27, 2023 Filing 49 STIPULATION Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Coordination of Related Cases by Humana Inc., Aetna Inc.. (Bennett, Blake)
October 16, 2023 Filing 48 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr., Uriel Rabinovitz and Thomas K. Griffith - filed by Humana Inc.. (Bennett, Blake)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (44 in 1:23-cv-01004-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr., Uriel Rabinovitz and Thomas K. Griffith, filed by Aetna Inc., (48 in 1:23-cv-01006-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr., Uriel Rabinovitz and Thomas K. Griffith, filed by Humana Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/16/2023. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-01006-CFC, 1:23-cv-01004-CFC (kmd)
October 3, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake A. Bennett on behalf of Humana Inc. (Bennett, Blake)
September 29, 2023 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Taylor P. Lovejoy, Dillon M. Knight, James E. Gallagher, and Christopher J. Marino for Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-01006-CFC and 1:23-cv-01004-CFC (mkr)
September 20, 2023 Filing 46 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher J. Marino, James E. Gallagher, Dillon M. Knight, and Taylor P. Lovejoy - filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC. (Silverstein, Alan)
September 20, 2023 Filing 45 STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-01004-CFC, 1:23-cv-01006-CFC(nmf)
September 20, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-01004-CFC, 1:23-cv-01006-CFC (rjb)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #46 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher J. Marino, James E. Gallagher, Dillon M. Knight, and Taylor P. Lovejoy, filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/20/2023. (kmd)
September 13, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Simon Latcovich, Esquire for Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Silverstein, Alan)
September 13, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Peter A. Strotz, Esquire for Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC by Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Silverstein, Alan)
September 13, 2023 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Richard Silverstein on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Silverstein, Alan)
September 13, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur G. Connolly, III on behalf of Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC (Connolly, Arthur)
September 13, 2023 Filing 40 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 10/13/2023. (apk)
September 13, 2023 Filing 39 Record of case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number in Other District: 4:23-cv-01550. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
September 12, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC of Withdrawal of Simon Latcovich as Counsel (Latcovich, Simon) (Filed on 9/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #30 Consent Motion to Transfer. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
August 31, 2023 Filing 36 Letter from Peter A. Strotz on behalf of Defendant Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC re: Motion to Transfer Venue. (Strotz, Peter) (Filed on 8/31/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
August 31, 2023 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CLERK'S NOTICE AT DOCKET #34. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that the Clerk's Notice at docket #34 was entered in error. Hearing re #30 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) set for 10/12/2023 at 01:00 PM - Videoconference Only before Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu pursuant to #32 Renotice of motion hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
August 31, 2023 Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case Venue #30 was renoticed for a hearing date that is no longer available hearing date on Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu's calendar. The 10/12/2023 01:00 PM hearing date is VACATED. Defendant shall re-notice (not re-file) the motion for a hearing in compliance with Local Rule 7-2(a) and Judge Ryu's Standing Order. The briefing schedule remains in effect. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
August 29, 2023 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byHanda Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Strotz, Peter) (Filed on 8/29/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
August 29, 2023 Filing 32 Renotice motion hearing re #30 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed byHanda Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Related document(s) #30 ) (Strotz, Peter) (Filed on 8/29/2023)[Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
August 29, 2023 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case Venue #30 was noticed for hearing on less than 35 days notice in violation of Local Rule 7-2(a) and on a date that is not an available hearing date on Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu's calendar. The 9/28/2023 01:00 PM hearing date is VACATED. Defendant shall re-notice (not re-file) the motion for a hearing in compliance with Local Rule 7-2(a) and Judge Ryu's Standing Order. The briefing schedule remains in effect. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
August 28, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 9/11/2023. Replies due by 9/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Strotz, Peter) (Filed on 8/28/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER on Motions to Remand. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/15/2023. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Simon Latcovich.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
July 25, 2023 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING DATE. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand set for hearing on 7/27/2023, at 1:00 PM is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date is hereby VACATED. The motion will be taken under submission and decided on the papers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
July 24, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Simon Latcovich (Latcovich, Simon) (Filed on 7/24/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
July 24, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18476889.) filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Latcovich, Simon) (Filed on 7/24/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting the parties' joint request to vacate the initial case management conference set for 7/5/2023 01:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/22/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
June 21, 2023 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Vacate the Initial Case Management Conferences filed by Humana Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew S. Weiler, #2 Proposed Order)(Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 6/21/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
June 14, 2023 Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 6/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
June 14, 2023 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand previously set for 6/22/2023 at 1:00 PM has been rescheduled to 7/27/2023 at 1:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
June 9, 2023 Filing 20 REPLY BRIEF in Support (re #15 MOTION to Remand) filed by Humana Inc.. (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 6/9/2023) Modified on 6/13/2023 (slh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
May 24, 2023 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Remand ) filed byHanda Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Strotz, Peter) (Filed on 5/24/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting (17) Stipulation re: Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motions to Remand in cases 4:23-cv-01550-DMR and 4:23-cv-01553-DMR. Signed on 5/5/2023.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
May 3, 2023 Filing 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: JOINT REQUEST REGARDING MOTION FOR REMAND BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter A. Strotz, #2 Proposed Order)(Strotz, Peter) (Filed on 5/3/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting (14) Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Deadline to Respond in cases 4:23-cv-01550-DMR, 4:23-cv-01553-DMR. Signed on 5/1/2023.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
April 28, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand filed by Humana Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2023 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 5/12/2023. Replies due by 5/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew S. Weiler)(Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 4/28/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
April 27, 2023 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANT HANDA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLCS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINTS filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Strotz, Peter) (Filed on 4/27/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
April 20, 2023 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference is set for 7/5/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RELATING CASES: Cases 4:23-cv-01550-DMR Humana Inc. v. Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC and 3:23-cv-01553-LB Aetna Inc. v. Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC are related. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/19/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Although the parties have consented to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge in this matter, they have not indicated whether they will consent or decline to proceed before a magistrate judge in Aetna Inc. v. Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, 23-cv-1553 LB, which they seek to relate to the instant case. The court will defer its decision on relation until the parties have indicated whether they will consent or decline in Aetna Inc. v. Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/17/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
April 14, 2023 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Humana Inc... (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 4/14/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
April 14, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Non Opposition to Defendant's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related by Humana Inc re #6 MOTION to Relate Case No. 23-cv-01553-LB (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 4/14/2023) Modified on 4/17/2023 (slh, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
April 13, 2023 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/27/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
April 12, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC.. (Strotz, Peter) (Filed on 4/12/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
April 6, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Relate Case No. 23-cv-01553-LB filed by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter A. Strotz, #2 Exhibit A - meet and confer email, #3 Exhibit B - Humana Inc. v. Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC - State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Aetna Inc. v. Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC - State Court Complaint, #5 Proposed Order)(Strotz, Peter) (Filed on 4/6/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
April 3, 2023 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/28/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/5/2023 at 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2023)[Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
April 3, 2023 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/17/2023. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
March 31, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Strotz, Peter) (Filed on 3/31/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
March 31, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC for Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Strotz, Peter) (Filed on 3/31/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]
March 31, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-23-605498. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18130810). Filed byHanda Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Handa Disclosure, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Notice of FIling Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Strotz, Peter) (Filed on 3/31/2023) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/13/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humana Inc. v. Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humana Inc.
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handa Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Alan Richard Silverstein
Represented By: Arthur G. Connolly, III
Represented By: Christopher J. Marino
Represented By: Dillon M. Knight
Represented By: James E. Gallagher
Represented By: Taylor P. Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?