Valentine Shabazz v. Bruce et al
Petitioner: Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz
Respondent: Cerron Cade, Jeff Flynn, John Carney, Chris Bruce and Nick Sabean
Case Number: 1:2023cv01097
Filed: October 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Filing 32 Return of Undeliverable Mail, enclosing case assignment notice, sent to Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz. Return to Sender - Insufficient Address - Unable to Forward. (jfm)
November 20, 2023 Remark: One copy of case assignment notice has been forwarded to the Plaintiff's updated address. (jfm)
November 2, 2023 Remark: One copy of the docket has been forwarded to the Plaintiff's updated address. (vfm)
November 1, 2023 Filing 31 Return of Undeliverable Mail enclosing docket sheet sent to Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz. Return to Sender - Insufficient Address - Unable to Forward. (vfm)
October 11, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
October 4, 2023 Filing 30 Record of case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number in Other District: 1:23-cv-07849. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
October 4, 2023 Remark: Copy of Docket Sheet Mailed to Pro Se Petitioner. (apk)
September 27, 2023 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Delaware.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TRANSFER ORDER: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Whether Plaintiff should be granted relief with respect to any pending motions (ECF 4 & 22) is a decision to be determined by the transferee court. Summonses shall not issue from this court. This order closes this action in this court. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/27/23) (rdz) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 27, 2023 Filing 28 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz, re: "JUDICIAL NOTICE" - I am giving you judicial notice that my education in Biotechnology was damaged and disrupted. The courts in Delaware and PA have retaliated over the fairly large transactions to the State of Delaware and the invasion of privacy overlooked. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 27, 2023 Filing 27 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz, dated 9/27/23 re: JUDICIAL NOTICE - Judge Ross of JP Court 13 has a record of the defendant, Christopher Bruce, stating that we worked on a project at the location as partners etc. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 26, 2023 Filing 26 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz,dated "EVIDENCE CLERY ACT" - What I am trying to get clarity on is why a local police station withholding evidence from an attack on me during the process of me obtaining my education. It is a violation of the Evidence Clery Act because I was working online with Harvard while in Delaware etc. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 25, 2023 Filing 25 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz, dated 9/25/23 re: "CULTURAL WAR" - I am requesting you to get a full investigation going on my security because, at any time, these men think I am going to change the reality they stole, they act out with violence. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) Modified on 9/27/2023 (sc). [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 25, 2023 Filing 24 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz, dated 9/25/23 re: "LETTER TO JUDGE INJUNCTION" - The purpose of filing an injunction is to stop harm from continuing. The longer you prolong the law in Section 4 of the NDA, the higher the chance olf continuous criminal enterprise. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 25, 2023 Filing 23 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz, dated 9/25/23 re: "EVIDENCE HATE CRIMES ON THE RISE IN DELAWARE" -This is a clear hate crime. The FBI has a phone on record, and I am requesting you get it for Evidence. There is too much fraud happening to a seasoned corporation. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 20, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION TO EXPEDITE PETITION/ORDER INJUNCTION & DECREE. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 13, 2023 Filing 21 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz, re: "DISCOVERY" - Between Delaware and the White House, who is a party in interest, the President owes 47th and 7th LLC billions in income under federal copyright laws. All rights reserved. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 12, 2023 Filing 20 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz, re: "ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE OF INFRINGEMENT" This law should be in effect today. John needed to figure out a ploy to make this cyber breach and me giving him data on 80 million customers he mishandled. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 11, 2023 Filing 19 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz, re: " EXHIBIT C - PICTURE". Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 11, 2023 Filing 18 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz, re: "EXHIBIT E - 911 DATA & LIFE STORY COPYRIGHTS" - We are requesting that Chris Bruce and Why Fly Internet be shut down. Jerry Walsh of Oracle specifically said he was dangerous. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 11, 2023 Filing 17 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz, re: "EXHIBIT D - BREAK THE CHAINS" - These cat 6 cables on my communications are very similar to chains. We are requesting you to break down the machine ASAP. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 11, 2023 Filing 10 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz, re: "EVIDENCE RETALIATION" - This is a blatant attempt at slavery period and violation of freedom of speech etc. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 10, 2023 Filing 16 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz, dated 9/1/23 re: "EVIDENCE RETALIATION" - It is widespread in every city. Nothing but federal agents who now turned into crime figures. The federal law computers are used for fraud.. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 10, 2023 Filing 15 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz re: "EVIDENCE RETALIATION" - Three years on the DNC and nothing but deaths. Zero ROI etc. Statute of Frauds/ Mass Tort/ Criminal Copyright Infringement. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 10, 2023 Filing 13 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz, re: "EVIDENCE RETALIATION" - Merrick Garland does not hear African Americans. He went to Harvard well before me and allows nothing but criminal acts on me and my family without any support in my backyard. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 10, 2023 Filing 12 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz, re: "EVIDENCE RETALIATION" - We are requesting an immediate payment and all insider threat development to stop per Georgia laws. We have a copyright and pending patent on Pierre Thomas etc. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 10, 2023 Filing 11 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz, re: "EVIDENCE" - This is a blatant attempt at a white man operating a black man organization without zero respect or law enforcement etc. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 10, 2023 Filing 9 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz, re: " BREACHED & UNPAID COPYRIGHT FEES" - The law is the law no matter who you are n ego. Obama is using unfair business practices and the federal government to allow him to commit fraud etc. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 10, 2023 Filing 8 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz, re: "EVIDENCE" - It is too many cases over a behemoth. They are scaring people etc. We are requesting FILA turn over 25 percent of all profits from 2008 and shutdown all relationships with Hulu, Wutang and attorneys from 20th Century Fox. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 10, 2023 Filing 7 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz, re: The portfolio belonging to Danny was violated directly by the governor of Delaware and his staff along with Chris Bruce etc. The New York Post asked who is the president because Joe uses Danny daily to launder money in Delaware to his friends. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 10, 2023 Filing 6 LETTER from D. Shabazz, re: AFFIDAVIT INSIDER THREAT DEVELOPMENT. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 10, 2023 Filing 5 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz re: EXHIBIT A FBI PHONE CALL & FILA/ CRATES DEAL DISRUPTED. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2023: #1 Exhibit 1) (sc). [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 9, 2023 Filing 4 PETITION(MOTION) ORDER FOR INJUNCTION & DECREE. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 8, 2023 Filing 14 LETTER from Danny Amen Anderson V. Shabazz, re: "EVIDENCE RETALIATION" - Three years on the DNC and nothing but deaths. Zero ROI etc. Statute of Frauds/ Mass Tort/ Criminal Copyright Infringement. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz.(sc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/7/2023) (vn) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 3, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]
September 3, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION Criminal Copyright Infringement. Document filed by Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/4/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentine Shabazz v. Bruce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danny Amen Anderson Valentine Shabazz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cerron Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chris Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nick Sabean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?