Cortez v. Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
Plaintiff: Mayra Cortez
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Actavis LLC, Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc., Sanofi S.A., Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Accord Healthcare Inc., Actavis Inc., Actavis Pharma Inc., Hospira Inc., Hospira Worldwide Inc., McKesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging, Sandoz Inc., Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories Ltd. and Sun Pharma Global FZE
Case Number: 1:2023cv01229
Filed: October 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2023 Filing 18 Joint Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Morgan, Michelle) Modified on 12/22/2023 (nms).
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORAL ORDER: A joint statement pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 is due no later than three (3) days from date of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2023. (nms)
December 11, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Christopher Gallagher on behalf of Mayra Cortez (Gallagher, Patrick)
November 20, 2023 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC filed by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Morgan, Michelle)
November 20, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matt DePaz - filed by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Morgan, Michelle)
November 20, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Ilana H. Eisenstein by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Morgan, Michelle)
November 20, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jeff Castellano of DLA Piper (US) by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Morgan, Michelle)
November 20, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Morgan on behalf of Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Morgan, Michelle)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matt DePaz, filed by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/20/2023. (nms)
November 17, 2023 Filing 10 Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Darin Lee Schanker (apk)
November 1, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
October 30, 2023 Filing 9 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 11/29/2023. (mkr)
October 27, 2023 Filing 8 Record of case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 2:17-cv-09283. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER- Case transferred to District of Delaware. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, 16511)(nml) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.]
September 29, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer of Orders, #2 Exhibit B - PTO, #3 Exhibit C - CMO, #4 Exhibit D - Pleadings, #5 Exhibit E - Orders on Dispositive Motions, #6 Exhibit F - Daubert Orders, #7 Exhibit G - MIL Orders)(Moore, Douglas) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Aventis Pharma S.A., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE. (Payton, Paige) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.]
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.]
September 19, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.]
September 18, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6365023) filed by Mayra Cortez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons)Attorney Jere Kyle Bachus added to party Mayra Cortez(pty:pla).(Bachus, Jere) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortez v. Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
Represented By: Jeff Castellano
Represented By: Michelle Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Pharma S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Jeff Castellano
Represented By: Michelle Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Jeff Castellano
Represented By: Michelle Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation doing business as McKesson Packaging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharma Global FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayra Cortez
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?