GLD Partners, L.P. et al v. Sagaliam Acquisition Corp.
Plaintiff: GLD Partners, L.P. and GLD Sponsor Member LLC
Defendant: Sagaliam Acquisition Corp.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01266
Filed: November 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 Filing 37 STIPULATION to Extend Time - filed by Sagaliam Acquisition Corp.. (Garibian, Antranig) Modified on 12/14/2023 (nms).
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #37 STIPULATION to Extend (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Sagaliam Acquisition Corp. answer due 1/19/2024). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/14/2023. (nms)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: The Temporary Restraining Order is hereby vacated and is superseded by this Preliminary Injunction Order (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/12/2023. (lah)
December 11, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Hearing on the portion of the Motion seeking issuance of a Preliminary Injunction held on 12/11/2023. Counsel for Plaintiffs: S. Bellew. Counsel for Defendant: A. Garibian. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi.) (lah)
December 6, 2023 Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sagaliam Acquisition Corp.- filed by GLD Partners, L.P., GLD Sponsor Member LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bellew, Sean)
December 6, 2023 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Daniel Gordon re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and to Expedite Discovery, by GLD Partners, L.P., GLD Sponsor Member LLC. (Bellew, Sean) Modified on 12/6/2023 (nms).
December 6, 2023 Filing 33 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and to Expedite Discovery filed by GLD Partners, L.P., GLD Sponsor Member LLC. (Bellew, Sean)
December 1, 2023 Filing 32 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and to Expedite Discovery filed by Sagaliam Acquisition Corp..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/8/2023. (Garibian, Antranig)
December 1, 2023 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIDT of Kelli Austin re #32 Answering Brief, filed by Sagaliam Acquisition Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Garibian, Antranig) Modified on 12/1/2023 (nms). Modified on 12/1/2023 (nms).
December 1, 2023 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Peter H. Haveles for GLD Partners, L.P. and GLD Sponsor Member LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk)
November 29, 2023 Filing 30 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #29 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Sagaliam Acquisition Corp..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/13/2023. (Garibian, Antranig) Modified on 11/30/2023 (nms).
November 29, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Sagaliam Acquisition Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Garibian, Antranig) Modified on 11/30/2023 (nms).
November 28, 2023 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Enzolytics, Inc. for Sagaliam Acquisition Corp. filed by Sagaliam Acquisition Corp.. (Garibian, Antranig)
November 28, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Antranig N. Garibian on behalf of Sagaliam Acquisition Corp. (Garibian, Antranig)
November 28, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 45 Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by GLD Partners, L.P., GLD Sponsor Member LLC.(Bellew, Sean)
November 27, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice filed by GLD Partners, L.P., GLD Sponsor Member LLC.(Bellew, Sean)
November 22, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing of an Injunction Bond, by GLD Partners, L.P., GLD Sponsor Member LLC. (Bellew, Sean) Modified on 11/22/2023 (nms).
November 20, 2023 Filing 23 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from H. Peter Haveles, Jr., regarding request for telephonic conference. (Bellew, Sean) Modified on 11/20/2023 (nms).
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: For the reasons set forth on the record, pursuant to Rule 65(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, plaintiffs shall post a bond in the amount of one hundred thousand dollars ($100,000.00) and shall file said bond with the Clerk of the Court within three (3) business days of entry of this Order. A hearing on the portion of the Motion seeking issuance of a Preliminary Injunction is set for December 11, 2023, at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 6A. Sagaliam shall file any papers in opposition to the Motion by the close of business (i.e., 5 p.m. EST) on December 1, 2023, and plaintiffs shall file any reply papers in further support of the Motion by the close of business on December 6, 2023 (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/20/2023. (nms)
November 19, 2023 Filing 21 PROPOSED Temporary Restraining Order, by GLD Partners, L.P., GLD Sponsor Member LLC. (Bellew, Sean) Modified on 11/20/2023 (nms).
November 17, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Motion Hearing held on 11/17/2023 re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Counsel present for Plaintiffs: S. Belllew, P. Haveles. Defendant did not appear. The opinion on the motion for temporary restraining order was read into the record. The Court will grant the TRO contingent on the Plaintiffs getting a proposed order submitted that contains all details as discussed at the hearing. Plaintiffs indicated the proposed order will be filed by Monday, November 20, 2023.(Court Reporter Heather Triozzi.) (nms)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The Court set a hearing on the TRO for Friday at 3 p.m. Defendant is to date unrepresented. That seems unlikely to change by tomorrow. Based on the letters submitted today (D.I. #18 ; D.I. #19 ), the Court does not expect Mr. Morris, Mr. Kostiner, or Ms. Austin to appear at the hearing. Without a lawyer, they would simply be observers. The TRO seeks to prevent a meeting on November 21. I cannot simply continue the hearing until a date after Thanksgiving. Thus, the Court needs to keep the hearing date. The hearing will be on the record. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/16/2023. (nms)
November 16, 2023 Filing 19 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Patrick Ryan Morris, Esq., requesting the hearing scheduled for 11/17/2023, be rescheduled. (nms)
November 16, 2023 Filing 18 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Kelli Austin, TTEE, regarding hearing scheduled for 11/17/2023. (nms)
November 15, 2023 Filing 17 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from H. Peter Haveles, Jr., regarding response to letter (D.I. #15 ). (Bellew, Sean) Modified on 11/16/2023 (nms).
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Court will hold a hearing on Plaintiffs motion for a TRO (D.I. #5 ) on November 17, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 6A. The Clerk is directed to email a copy of this order to kellidaustin@gmail.com, prm(@patrickmorrislaw.com, bkostiner@legacyeducation.com, barrykostiner@legacyea.com, and bkostiner@fintecham.com.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/15/2023. (nms)
November 15, 2023 Filing 15 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Kelli Austin, TTEE, regarding service and request for a stay. (Attachments: #1 Attachments 1-4)(nms)
November 15, 2023 Remark: A copy of the order filed at D.I. #16 has been emailed to the recipients listed in the order. (nms)
November 14, 2023 Filing 14 Letter to Honorable Richard G. Andrew, from H. Peter Haveles, Jr., regarding Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and to Expedite Discovery (D.I. #5 ). (Bellew, Sean) Modified on 11/14/2023 (nms).
November 14, 2023 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Notices of Appearance filed at D.I. 15 have been removed from the docket. Local counsel for the plaintiffs is directed to contact the Clerk's Office Help Desk regarding the appropriate steps on getting out of state counsel set up for electronic noticing. (nms) Modified on 11/14/2023 (nms).
November 9, 2023 Filing 13 DECLARATION of H. Peter Haveles, Jr. regarding servicve of Order (D.I. 11 ), by GLD Partners, L.P., GLD Sponsor Member LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bellew, Sean) Modified on 11/9/2023 (nms).
November 9, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, Plaintiff's Motion For A Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction And Expedited Discovery, Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion and the Declaration of Daniel Gordon in Support of Motion. served on Registered Agent, Litigation Management Representative, 251 Little Falls Drive, Wilmington, DE 19808. on November 8, 2023, filed by GLD Partners, L.P., GLD Sponsor Member LLC. (Bellew, Sean)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORAL ORDER: Defendant is to respond to Plaintiffs motion (D.I. #5 ) by the COB November 13, 2023. Plaintiff is to provide notice of this order to Defendants counsel if known and to Defendant itself ASAP, and to put on the docket how it has complied with this order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/9/2023. (nms)
November 8, 2023 Filing 10 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and to Expedite Discovery filed by GLD Partners, L.P., GLD Sponsor Member LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/22/2023. (Bellew, Sean)
November 8, 2023 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Daniel Gordon re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and to Expedite Discovery, by GLD Partners, L.P., GLD Sponsor Member LLC. (Bellew, Sean) Modified on 11/8/2023 (nms).
November 8, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GLD Partners, L.P., GLD Sponsor Member LLC.Sagaliam Acquisition Corp. served on 11/8/2023, answer due 11/29/2023. (Bellew, Sean)
November 8, 2023 CORRECTING ENTRY: The brief and declaration filed as attachments to D.I. #5 have been removed from that entry. Motions, briefs, and declarations are to be filed independent of each other. Counsel is to refile the brief and declaration accordingly. (nms)
November 8, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Donald David, filed by GLD Partners, L.P., GLD Sponsor Member LLC, and #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney H. Peter Haveles, Jr., filed by GLD Partners, L.P., GLD Sponsor Member LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/8/2023. (nms)
November 7, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Donald David - filed by GLD Partners, L.P., GLD Sponsor Member LLC. (Bellew, Sean)
November 7, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney H. Peter Haveles, Jr. - filed by GLD Partners, L.P., GLD Sponsor Member LLC. (Bellew, Sean)
November 7, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and to Expedite Discovery - filed by GLD Partners, L.P., GLD Sponsor Member LLC. (Bellew, Sean) Modified on 11/8/2023 (nms).
November 7, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sagaliam Acquisition Corp. on 11/7/2023. (mpb)
November 7, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by GLD Partners, L.P., GLD Sponsor Member LLC. (mpb)
November 7, 2023 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
November 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Sagaliam Acquisition Corp. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4267375.) - filed by GLD Partners, L.P., GLD Sponsor Member LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLD Partners, L.P. et al v. Sagaliam Acquisition Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLD Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Sean J. Bellew
Represented By: Peter H. Haveles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLD Sponsor Member LLC
Represented By: Sean J. Bellew
Represented By: Peter H. Haveles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagaliam Acquisition Corp.
Represented By: Antranig N. Garibian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?