Dan Dee International, LLC et al v. Global New Ventures Group LC et al
Plaintiff: Dan Dee International, LLC, DanDee Hong Kong Holdings Limited and Dan Dee International Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Global New Ventures Group LC, Lee Capozzi and Patrick Lee
Case Number: 1:2023cv01274
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Gregory B Williams
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2024 Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lee Capozzi, Global New Ventures Group LC, Patrick Lee- filed by Dan Dee International, LLC, DanDee Hong Kong Holdings Limited, Dan Dee International Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exs. A-L)(Flynn, Michael)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant Global New Ventures Group LC's Motion to Dismiss (D.I. 8) or to amend the Complaint to January 5, 2024 filed by Dan Dee International, LLC, DanDee Hong Kong Holdings Limited, Dan Dee International Holdings, Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 12/18/23. (ntl)
December 15, 2023 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant Global New Ventures Group LC's Motion to Dismiss (D.I. 8) or to amend the Complaint to January 5, 2024 - filed by Dan Dee International Holdings, Inc., Dan Dee International, LLC, DanDee Hong Kong Holdings Limited. (Flynn, Michael)
December 5, 2023 Filing 11 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 1/4/2024. (apk)
December 5, 2023 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Laya Iliria in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Global New Ventures Group LC. (jfm)
December 5, 2023 Filing 9 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Global New Ventures Group LC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/19/2023. (jfm)
December 5, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction - filed by Global New Ventures Group LC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(jfm)
November 16, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dan Dee International, LLC, DanDee Hong Kong Holdings Limited, Dan Dee International Holdings, Inc..Lee Capozzi served on 11/15/2023, answer due 12/6/2023. (Flynn, Michael)
November 15, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dan Dee International, LLC, DanDee Hong Kong Holdings Limited, Dan Dee International Holdings, Inc..Global New Ventures Group LC served on 11/14/2023, answer due 12/5/2023. (Flynn, Michael)
November 15, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 8, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Lee Capozzi on 11/8/2023; Global New Ventures Group LC on 11/8/2023; Patrick Lee on 11/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Summons Issued) (vfm)
November 8, 2023 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Dan Dee International Holdings, Inc. for Dan Dee International, LLC, DanDee Hong Kong Holdings Limited filed by Dan Dee International Holdings, Inc., Dan Dee International, LLC,, DanDee Hong Kong Holdings Limited. (vfm)
November 8, 2023 Filing 3 Report to the Register of Copyrights for Copyright Number(s)VAu001509480;. (vfm)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (vfm)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Lee Capozzi, Global New Ventures Group LC, Patrick Lee ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4269456.) - filed by Dan Dee International, LLC, DanDee Hong Kong Holdings Limited, Dan Dee International Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (vfm)
November 8, 2023 Remark: Register of Copyrights AO-121 Report Form at D.I. #3 has been mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (vfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dan Dee International, LLC et al v. Global New Ventures Group LC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Dee International, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DanDee Hong Kong Holdings Limited
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Dee International Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global New Ventures Group LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Capozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?