Lewis v. AT&T Corporate
Plaintiff: Racquel Lewis
Defendant: AT&T Corporate
Case Number: 1:2023cv01276
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2023 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of AO 85 Forms, filed by Racquel Lewis. (vfm) Modified on 12/5/2023 (nms).
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/15/2023. (lah)
November 15, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-01275-RGA, 1:23-cv-01276-RGA (rjb)
November 8, 2023 Filing 4 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
November 8, 2023 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against AT&T Corporate - filed by Racquel Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Racquel Lewis. (mpb)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION to Seal - filed by Racquel Lewis. (mpb)
November 8, 2023 Remark: Magistrate Consent Form, Receipt of Magistrate Consent Form, and Pro-se Privacy Notice have been mailed to Plaintiff. (mpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. AT&T Corporate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Racquel Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corporate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?