Baffone et al v. Small Business Administration et al
Plaintiff: Dominick J. Baffone, III, Jean Baffone, Marc A. Baffone and Kathleen W. Baffone
Defendant: Small Business Administration, Administrator Isabella Casillas Guzman, First Chatham Bank and Isabella Casillas Guzman
Case Number: 1:2023cv01278
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 631 Small Business Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT by Dominick J. Baffone, III, Jean Baffone, Kathleen W. Baffone, Marc A. Baffone. (Sullivan, William)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, on or before 12/18/2023, the parties shall file a joint status report. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/11/2023. (dlw)
November 15, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Dominick J. Baffone, III, Jean Baffone, Kathleen W. Baffone, Marc A. Baffone re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Sullivan, William)
November 15, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 13, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by First Chatham Bank.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Defendant's Brief in Opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Defendant's Brief in Opposition, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Defendant's Brief in Opposition, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Defendant's Brief in Opposition, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Defendant's Brief in Opposition, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Defendant's Brief in Opposition, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G to Defendant's Brief in Opposition, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H to Defendant's Brief in Opposition, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I to Defendant's Brief in Opposition, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J to Defendant's Brief in Opposition, #11 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service of Defendant's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(McLaughlin, Brian)
November 13, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Isabella Casillas Guzman, Small Business Administration.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/20/2023. (Steinberg, Dylan)
November 13, 2023 Filing 8 Supplemental DECLARATION of Service re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Opening Brief in Support, #5 Letter, 6 Oral Order Order Setting Hearing on Motion, #1 Complaint by Dominick J. Baffone, III, Jean Baffone, Kathleen W. Baffone, Marc A. Baffone. (Sullivan, William) Modified on 11/15/2023 (dlw).
November 13, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maryellen Noreika - Motion Hearing held on 11/13/2023 re #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Given the statements on the record, the parties shall confer and submit a joint status report by 4:00 PM TODAY. The Court will reconvene on the phone if necessary. (Court Reporter Dale Hawkins.) (mdb)
November 10, 2023 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Service re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Opening Brief in Support, #5 Letter, 6 Oral Order Order Setting Hearing on Motion, #1 Complaint by Dominick J. Baffone, III, Jean Baffone, Kathleen W. Baffone, Marc A. Baffone. (Sullivan, William) Modified on 11/15/2023 (dlw).
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORAL ORDER re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of the #1 Complaint with exhibits, #3 Motion for TRO/PI, #4 Opening Brief, #5 Letter and this Oral Order on all Defendants and shall file a proof of service regarding same. Defendants may file an answering brief(s) no later than 10:00 AM on Monday, November 13, 2023. The Court will hold a TELEPHONIC hearing on the #3 MOTION for TRO/PI at 12:00 PM on Monday, November 13, 2023. Counsel shall provide a teleconference dial-in number and code for the hearing by emailing this Court's Judicial Administrator (diana_welham@ded.uscourts.gov). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/9/2023. (dlw)
November 9, 2023 Filing 5 Letter to Randall C. Lohan from William D. Sullivan regarding regarding request that a duty judge review motion for temprorary restraining order and preliminary injunction and schedule a hearing before November 14, 2023 - re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #4 Opening Brief in Support, #1 Complaint,. (Sullivan, William)
November 9, 2023 Filing 4 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Dominick J. Baffone, III, Jean Baffone, Kathleen W. Baffone, Marc A. Baffone.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A through C)(Sullivan, William)
November 9, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by Dominick J. Baffone, III, Jean Baffone, Kathleen W. Baffone, Marc A. Baffone. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction)(Sullivan, William)
November 9, 2023 Remark: Exit copies to Duty Judge (MN). (jfm)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against First Chatham Bank, Isabella Casillas Guzman, Small Business Administration (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4269722.) - filed by Jean Baffone, Dominick J. Baffone, III, Marc A. Baffone, Kathleen W. Baffone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Z, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jfm)
November 8, 2023 No Summons Issued. (jfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baffone et al v. Small Business Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick J. Baffone, III
Represented By: William D. Sullivan
Represented By: Elihu Ezekiel Allinson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Baffone
Represented By: William D. Sullivan
Represented By: Elihu Ezekiel Allinson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc A. Baffone
Represented By: William D. Sullivan
Represented By: Elihu Ezekiel Allinson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen W. Baffone
Represented By: William D. Sullivan
Represented By: Elihu Ezekiel Allinson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrator Isabella Casillas Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Chatham Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabella Casillas Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?