Nieves v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Ruby Nieves
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv01366
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery completed by 8/14/2024. Opening Expert Reports due by 9/30/2024. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 11/14/2024. Surreply Expert Reports due by 2/13/2025. Reply Expert Reports due by 12/30/2024. Expert Discovery due by 3/17/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2025. A Pretrial Conference is set for 9/8/2025 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Maryellen Noreika. A 10-day Jury Trial is set for 9/15/2025 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Maryellen Noreika. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/26/2024. (dlw)
January 17, 2024 Filing 21 Joint STATEMENT re 17 Oral Order // Proposed Scheduling Order by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [Proposed] Scheduling Order)(Morgan, Michelle) Modified on 1/18/2024 (dlw).
January 9, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Christopher Elliott - filed by Ruby Nieves. (Attachments: #1 Certification of John Christopher Elliott)(Gallagher, Patrick)
January 9, 2024 Filing 19 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for John Christopher Elliott. ( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4310176).(Gallagher, Patrick)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Christopher Elliott filed by Ruby Nieves. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/9/2024. (dlw)
December 19, 2023 Filing 18 Return of Undeliverable Mail of D.I. #10 sent to Darin Lee Schanker. Not Deliverable as Addressed. Unable to Forward. (mpb)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposed order, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The parties are to use the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Noreika, Forms). If there are disputes or issues that the Court needs to address in the proposed scheduling order, the parties shall direct the Court to the paragraph numbers in which those appear in a cover letter to the Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/18/2023. (dlw)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matt DePaz filed by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/12/2023. (dlw)
December 11, 2023 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC filed by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Morgan, Michelle)
December 11, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matt DePaz - filed by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Morgan, Michelle)
December 11, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Ilana H. Eisenstein on behalf of Defendants Sanofi U.S. Services Inc. and sanofi-aventis U.S. LLC by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Morgan, Michelle)
December 11, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff Castellano on behalf of Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Castellano, Jeff)
December 11, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Morgan on behalf of Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Morgan, Michelle)
December 11, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Christopher Gallagher on behalf of Ruby Nieves (Gallagher, Patrick)
December 6, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 30, 2023 Filing 10 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 1/2/2024. (mkr)
November 30, 2023 Filing 9 Record of case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 2:17-cv-09669. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TRANSFER ORDER- Case transferred to District of Delaware. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, 16511)(nml) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/30/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Filing 7 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7)(Brilleaux, Kelly) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/30/2023.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/30/2023.]
December 16, 2017 Filing 5 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Schanker, Darin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/30/2023.]
October 5, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Aventis Pharma S.A., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Pfizer, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global FZE. (Payton, Paige) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/30/2023.]
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/30/2023.]
September 27, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/30/2023.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6382494) filed by Ruby Nieves. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)Attorney Jere Kyle Bachus added to party Ruby Nieves(pty:pla).(Bachus, Jere) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/30/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nieves v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
Represented By: Jeff Castellano
Represented By: Michelle Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Jeff Castellano
Represented By: Michelle Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Jeff Castellano
Represented By: Michelle Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Nieves
Represented By: Patrick Christopher Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?