State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. NVR, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: NVR, Inc., CECO, Inc., Integrated Technologies Group Ltd., Catonsville Electric Co., Carlos Enrique Madrid individually doing business as Madrid Electric's General Service, Karla Madrid individually doing business as Madrid Electric's General Service, Madrid Electrical Contracting Inc. and Madrid Electric, LLC
Cross Claimant: Karla Madrid
Cross Defendant: Carlos Enrique Madrid
Case Number: 1:2023cv01368
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Joel H Slomsky
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Filing 17 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Sean P. ODonnell. ( re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sean P. ODonnell )( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4322192).(Ekiner, Kaan)
January 25, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sean P. ODonnell - filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Ekiner, Kaan)
January 18, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with 12 Juror Trial Demanded , CROSSCLAIM against CECO, Inc., Catonsville Electric Co., Integrated Technologies Group Ltd., Carlos Enrique Madrid, Madrid Electrical Contracting Inc., NVR, Inc. by Karla Madrid, Madrid Electric, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Verification Disclosure IN ACCORDANCE WITH F.R.C.P 7.1.1 (a)(2))(Rohs, Timothy)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: DESIGNATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE TO HOLD A DISTRICT COURT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT, designating and assigning the Honorable Joel H. Slomsky of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Michael A Chagares, Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on 1/11/2024. (rjb)
January 11, 2024 Case Reassigned to Judge Joel H Slomsky of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Please include the initials of the Judge (JHS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 2, 2024 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Carlos Enrique Madrid, individually and dba Madrid Electric's General Service on December 21, 2023, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Ekiner, Kaan)
January 2, 2024 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Catonsville Electric Co. on December 20, 2023, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Ekiner, Kaan)
January 2, 2024 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Ceco, Inc. on December 20, 2023, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Ekiner, Kaan)
January 2, 2024 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Madrid Electric, LLC on December 27, 2023, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Ekiner, Kaan)
January 2, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on NVR, Inc. dba Ryan Homes on December 20, 2023, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Ekiner, Kaan)
January 2, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Karla Madrid, individually and dba Madrid Electric's General Service on December 27, 2023, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Ekiner, Kaan)
December 29, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by NVR, Inc.: For NVR, Inc. waiver sent on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/20/2024. (Wilcox, Scott)
December 28, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott G Wilcox on behalf of NVR, Inc. (Wilcox, Scott)
December 6, 2023 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES (nmf)
December 6, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CECO, Inc., Catonsville Electric Co., Integrated Technologies Group Ltd., Carlos Enrique Madrid, Karla Madrid, Madrid Electric, LLC, Madrid Electrical Contracting Inc., and NVR, Inc. on 11/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued CECO, Inc., #2 Summons Issued Integrated Technologies Group, Ltd., #3 Summons Issued Catonsville Electric Co., #4 Summons Issued Catonsville Electric Co. (2), #5 Summons Issued Carlos Enrique Madrid, #6 Summons Issued Karla Madrid, #7 Summons Issued Madrid Electrical Contracting Inc., #8 Summons Issued Madrid Electrical Contracting Inc., #9 Summons Issued Madrid Electric, LLC)(jfm)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (jfm)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against CECO, Inc., Catonsville Electric Co., Integrated Technologies Group Ltd., Carlos Enrique Madrid, Karla Madrid, Madrid Electric, LLC, Madrid Electrical Contracting Inc., NVR, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BDEDC-4283653.) - filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. NVR, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Kaan Ekiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NVR, Inc.
Represented By: Scott G Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CECO, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated Technologies Group Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catonsville Electric Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Enrique Madrid individually doing business as Madrid Electric's General Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Madrid individually doing business as Madrid Electric's General Service
Represented By: Timothy H. Rohs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madrid Electrical Contracting Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madrid Electric, LLC
Represented By: Timothy H. Rohs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Karla Madrid
Represented By: Timothy H. Rohs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Carlos Enrique Madrid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?