Bayer Pharma AG et al v. Aurobindo Pharma Limited et al
Plaintiff: Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer AG and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma Limited and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv01372
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to February 9, 2024 - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA Inc.. (Myer, R.) Modified on 1/26/2024 (nms).
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (D.I. 212 in 21-md-3017-RGA-LDH; D.I. 13 in 23-cv-1372-RGA) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint to February 9, 2024. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/26/2024. Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03017-RGA-LDH, 1:23-cv-01372-RGA(nms)
January 26, 2024 Reset Answer Deadlines: Aurobindo Pharma Limited answer due 2/9/2024; Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. answer due 2/9/2024. (nms)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Aurobindo Pharma Limited answer due 1/26/2024; Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. answer due 1/26/2024). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/29/2023. (nms)
December 28, 2023 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Complaint to January 26, 2024 - filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Myer, R.) Modified on 12/28/2023 (nms).
December 28, 2023 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Aurobindo Pharma Limited for Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. filed by Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. (Myer, R.)
December 28, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Touhey Myer on behalf of Aurobindo Pharma Limited, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. (Myer, R.)
December 11, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and related papers served on Aurobindo Pharma Limited on December 8, 2023, filed by Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek)
December 8, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer AG.Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. (Fahnestock, Derek)
December 6, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 1, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Aurobindo Pharma Limited on 12/1/2023; Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. on 12/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued)(mkr)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (mkr)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer Pharma AG filed by Bayer AG and Bayer Pharma AG. (mkr)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,828,310 B2. (mkr)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: No earlier than October 17, 2023. Date of Expiration of Patent: January 31, 2039.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: No earlier than April 17. 2026. (mkr)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mkr)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Aurobindo Pharma Limited, and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4284983.) - filed by Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and Bayer AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mkr)
December 1, 2023 Remark: MDL panel has been advised. (mkr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayer Pharma AG et al v. Aurobindo Pharma Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayer Pharma AG
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayer AG
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma Limited
Represented By: R. Touhey Myer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
Represented By: R. Touhey Myer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?