Prisoners Legal Advocacy Network v. Carney et al
Plaintiff: Prisoners Legal Advocacy Network
Defendant: John Carney, Anthony J. Albence and Terra Taylor
Case Number: 1:2023cv01397
Filed: December 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Hall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORAL ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion: A hearing on the pending Motion for Early Preliminary Injunction Hearing Date, Preliminary Injunction, and Temporary Restraining Order (D.I. #9 ) is scheduled for April 19, 2024 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 1/17/2024. (ceg)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SO ORDERED, re #15 Stipulation Governing Response to Complaint and Motion. (* Set Briefing Schedule re #9 MOTION for Early Preliminary Injunction Hearing Date, Preliminary Injunction, and Temporary Restraining Order: Answering Brief due 2/16/2024; Reply Brief due 3/8/2024). Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 1/17/2024. (ceg)
January 17, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Lee-Kay Wan on behalf of Anthony J. Albence, John Carney, Terra Taylor (Wan, Kenneth)
January 17, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Zi-Xiang Shen on behalf of Anthony J. Albence, John Carney, Terra Taylor (Shen, Zi-Xiang)
January 12, 2024 Filing 15 STIPULATION Governing Response to Complaint and Motion by Prisoners Legal Advocacy Network. (Keller, Karen)
January 9, 2024 Case Reassigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 21, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed on December 21, 2023 as to Attorney General - Delaware Department of Justice. (DiBenedetto, Emily)
December 21, 2023 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Casey K. Smith, Jonathan S. Topaz, Sophia L. Lakin, Seth H. Victor, Stephen D. Hibbard, Aaron M. Francis, Michael J. Lebowich, Godfre O. Blackman, and Dixie M. Morrison for Prisoners Legal Advocacy Network added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
December 20, 2023 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Attorney General for the State of Delaware. (smg)
December 20, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Topaz, Casey Smith, Sophia Lin Lakin, Stephen D. Hibbard, Aaron M. Francis, Seth H. Victor, Dixie M. Morrison, Michael J. Lebowich and Godfre O. Blackman - filed by Prisoners Legal Advocacy Network. (DiBenedetto, Emily)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Topaz, Casey Smith, Sophia Lin Lakin, Stephen D. Hibbard, Aaron M. Francis, Seth H. Victor, Dixie M. Morrison, Michael J. Lebowich and Godfre O. Blackman filed by Prisoners Legal Advocacy Network. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/20/2023. (dlw)
December 15, 2023 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Emily S. DiBenedetto re #10 Opening Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Early Preliminary Injunction Hearing Date, Preliminary Injunction, and Temporary Restraining Order by Prisoners Legal Advocacy Network. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(DiBenedetto, Emily) Modified on 12/15/2023 (mdb).
December 15, 2023 Filing 10 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #9 MOTION for Early Preliminary Injunction Hearing Date, Preliminary Injunction, and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Prisoners Legal Advocacy Network.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/29/2023. (DiBenedetto, Emily) Modified on 12/15/2023 (mdb).
December 15, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Early Preliminary Injunction Hearing Date, Preliminary Injunction, and Temporary Restraining Order - filed by Prisoners Legal Advocacy Network. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiBenedetto, Emily) Modified on 12/15/2023 (mdb).
December 14, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Dwayne Julian Bensing on behalf of Prisoners Legal Advocacy Network (Bensing, Dwayne)
December 13, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 11, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Prisoners Legal Advocacy Network.Anthony J. Albence served on 12/11/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (Keller, Karen)
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Prisoners Legal Advocacy Network.Terra Taylor served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. (Keller, Karen)
December 11, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Prisoners Legal Advocacy Network.John Carney served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. (Keller, Karen)
December 7, 2023 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Prisoners Legal Advocacy Network. (vfm)
December 7, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Anthony J. Albence on 12/7/2023; John Carney on 12/7/2023; and Terra Taylor on 12/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Summons Issued) (mkr)
December 7, 2023 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mkr)
December 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Anthony J. Albence, John Carney, and Terra Taylor (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4289512.) - filed by Prisoners Legal Advocacy Network. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Civil Cover Sheet) (mkr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prisoners Legal Advocacy Network v. Carney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prisoners Legal Advocacy Network
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Represented By: Emily DiBenedetto
Represented By: Aaron M. Francis
Represented By: Casey K. Smith
Represented By: Dixie M. Morrison
Represented By: Dwayne Julian Bensing
Represented By: Godfre O. Blackman
Represented By: Jonathan S. Topaz
Represented By: Michael J. Lebowich
Represented By: Seth H. Victor
Represented By: Sophia L. Lakin
Represented By: Stephen D. Hibbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Carney
Represented By: Kenneth Lee-Kay Wan
Represented By: Zi-Xiang Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Albence
Represented By: Kenneth Lee-Kay Wan
Represented By: Zi-Xiang Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terra Taylor
Represented By: Kenneth Lee-Kay Wan
Represented By: Zi-Xiang Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?