Curator IP LLC v. Travel Leaders Group Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: Curator IP LLC
Defendant: Travel Leaders Group Holdings, LLC doing business as Internova Travel Group
Case Number: 1:2023cv01464
Filed: December 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Joel H Slomsky
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas R. Johnson and John P. Olson for Travel Leaders Group Holdings, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mkr)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting D.I. #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John P. Olson. Signed by Judge Joel H Slomsky on 2/20/2024. (apk)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting D.I. #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas R. Johnson. Signed by Judge Joel H Slomsky on 2/20/2024. (apk)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting D.I. #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David Dormont. Signed by Judge Joel H Slomsky on 2/20/2024. (apk)
February 20, 2024 Filing 17 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for David Dormont, Thomas R. Johnson, and John P. Olson. ( re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas R. Johnson, #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John P. Olson, #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Dormont )( Payment of $ 150, receipt number ADEDC-4342174).(Donaldson, Richard)
February 20, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John P. Olson - filed by Travel Leaders Group Holdings, LLC. (Donaldson, Richard)
February 20, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas R. Johnson - filed by Travel Leaders Group Holdings, LLC. (Donaldson, Richard)
February 20, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David Dormont - filed by Travel Leaders Group Holdings, LLC. (Donaldson, Richard)
February 14, 2024 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per Counsel's request, D.I. #13 Main Document has been replaced to reflect the correct name of the Defendant. (mpb)
February 13, 2024 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Travel Leaders Group Holdings, LLC. (Donaldson, Richard) (Main Document 13 replaced on 2/14/2024) (mpb).
February 13, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Travel Leaders Group Holdings, LLC.(Donaldson, Richard)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, upon consideration of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Travel Leaders Group Holdings, LLC to respond to Complaint (Doc. No. #10 ), it is ORDERED that the Motion to Extend Time (Doc. No. #10 ) is GRATNED. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint (Doc. No. #1 ) by February 15, 2024. Signed by Judge Joel H Slomsky on 1/30/2024. (mpb)
January 11, 2024 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or otherwise Respond to the Complaint to February 15, 2024 - filed by Curator IP LLC. (Sharp, Melanie)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: DESIGNATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE TO HOLD A DISTRICT COURT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT, designating and assigning the Honorable Joel H. Slomsky of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Michael A Chagares, Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit on 1/11/2024. (rjb)
January 11, 2024 Case Reassigned to Judge Joel H Slomsky of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Please include the initials of the Judge (JHS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 3, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Vikram A. Mathrani for Curator IP LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
December 28, 2023 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Deborah J. Swedlow for Curator IP LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
December 28, 2023 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Amanda M. Blackburn for Curator IP LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk)
December 27, 2023 Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES (nmf)
December 27, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Deborah Swedlow, Vikram A. Mathrani, and Amanda M. Blackburn filed by Curator IP LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/27/2023. (nmf)
December 26, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Curator IP LLC.Travel Leaders Group Holdings, LLC served on 12/26/2023, answer due 1/16/2024. (Hallowell, Taylor)
December 26, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Deborah Swedlow, Vikram A. Mathrani, and Amanda M. Blackburn - filed by Curator IP LLC. (jfm)
December 26, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Travel Leaders Group Holdings, LLC on 12/26/2023. (jfm)
December 26, 2023 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Pebblebrook Hotel, L.P., Corporate Parent CuratorBrook Hotel LLC, Corporate Parent ALG-Curator LLC, Corporate Parent OLS Hotels & Resorts LLC, Corporate Parent Davidson Hotel Company LLC, Corporate Parent Noble House Hotels & Resorts, Ltd., Corporate Parent Sage Enterprise Holdings, LLC for Curator IP LLC filed by Curator IP LLC. (jfm)
December 26, 2023 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6349808; 6349429. (jfm)
December 26, 2023 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm)
December 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Travel Leaders Group Holdings, LLC (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4301386.) - filed by Curator IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(jfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curator IP LLC v. Travel Leaders Group Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curator IP LLC
Represented By: Melanie K. Sharp
Represented By: James L. Higgins
Represented By: Taylor E. Hallowell
Represented By: Amanda M. Blackburn
Represented By: Deborah J. Swedlow
Represented By: Vikram A. Mathrani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travel Leaders Group Holdings, LLC doing business as Internova Travel Group
Represented By: Richard Montgomery Donaldson
Represented By: John P. Olson
Represented By: Thomas R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?