Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00018
Filed: January 9, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Hall
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2024 Filing 38 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/15/2024. (Silver, Daniel)
February 20, 2024 Filing 37 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the Deadline for Plaintiff to File its Answering Brief In Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) to March 8, 2024 - filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Silver, Daniel)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #37 Stipulation and Order to Extend the Deadline for Plaintiff to File its Answering Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss to March 8, 2024. (*Reset Briefing Schedule re #33 Motion to Dismiss: Answering Brief due 3/8/2024). Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 2/20/2024. (ceg)
February 16, 2024 Filing 36 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for John Christopher Rozendaal,, Monica R. Talley, and Chandrika Vira. ( re #35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Christopher Rozendaal, Monica R. Talley and Chandrika Vira )( Payment of $ 150, receipt number ADEDC-4340430).(Keller, Karen)
February 16, 2024 Filing 35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Christopher Rozendaal, Monica R. Talley and Chandrika Vira - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
February 16, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys John C. Rozendaal, Monica R. Talley, and Chandrika Vira for Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John Christopher Rozendaal, Monica R. Talley and Chandrika Vira filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 2/16/2024. (ceg)
February 9, 2024 Filing 34 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/23/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Keller, Karen)
February 9, 2024 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, Karen)
February 2, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sarah P. Hogarth, Paul W. Hughes, and Charles H. Seidell for Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mkr)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' Joint Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 (D.I. #32 ), IT IS ORDERED that Defendant may re-file its Motion to Dismiss in compliance with the Delaware Local Rules on or before February 9, 2024. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 2/1/2024. (ceg)
January 31, 2024 Filing 32 Joint STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 2/1/2024 (ceg).
January 31, 2024 Filing 31 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Paul W. Hughes, Sarah P. Hogarth, and Charles Seidell. ( re #30 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul W. Hughes, Sarah P. Hogarth, and Charles Seidell )( Payment of $ 150, receipt number ADEDC-4327360).(Silver, Daniel)
January 31, 2024 Filing 30 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul W. Hughes, Sarah P. Hogarth, and Charles Seidell - filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Paul W. Hughes, Sarah P. Hogarth, and Charles Seidell)(Silver, Daniel)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #29 Stipulation to Extend Time to submit status report pursuant to D. Del. Local Rule 81.2 to January 31, 2024. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 1/31/2024. (ceg)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul W. Hughes, Sarah P. Hogarth, and Charles Seidell filed by Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 1/31/2024. (ceg)
January 30, 2024 Filing 29 STIPULATION to Extend Time to submit status report pursuant to D. Del. LR 81.2 to January 31, 2024 by Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. (Hoeschen, Nathan) Modified on 1/31/2024 (ceg).
January 16, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Elizabeth Keller on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. (Keller, Karen)
January 16, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Shaw on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. (Shaw, John)
January 16, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Roger Hoeschen on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc. (Hoeschen, Nathan)
January 12, 2024 Case Reassigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00152-JLH, 1:23-cv-00153-JLH, 1:24-cv-00018-JLH (rjb)
January 10, 2024 Filing 25 STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES (nmf)
January 10, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Silver on behalf of Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Silver, Daniel)
January 10, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Joyce, Alexandra)
January 10, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 9, 2024 Filing 22 Local Counsel Letter sent via mail. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 2/8/2024. (vfm)
January 9, 2024 Filing 21 Record of case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number in Other District: 2:23-cv-00511. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file with documents numbered 1 - 20 attached
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. The Clerk of the Court shall not transfer this case for fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 12/26/2023. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]
December 26, 2023 Filing 19 OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 12/26/2023. (dam) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]
August 7, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by LIZA M. WALSH (WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]
June 5, 2023 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court - District of Delaware, or to Dismiss (WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER ORDER granting Defendant's request for an extension of time until 6/5/2023 for Teva to file its reply paper in further support of its Motion to Transfer and Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 5/30/2023. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]
May 25, 2023 Filing 15 Letter from Liza M. Walsh, Esq. to Honorable Michael E. Farbiarz, U.S.D.J. re: extension request. (WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael E. Farbiarz for all further proceedings. Judge Claire C. Cecchi no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 5/24/2023. (adc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]
May 15, 2023 Filing 13 BRIEF in Opposition filed by VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court - District of Delaware, or to Dismiss (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER ORDER granting plaintiff's request that its deadline to respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer and Motion to Dismiss is extended two weeks until 5/15/2023; Defendant's reply is due 5/29/2023. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 5/2/2023. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]
April 29, 2023 Filing 11 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. requesting the entry of a briefing schedule (on consent) re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court - District of Delaware, or to Dismiss . (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]
April 10, 2023 Filing 10 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court - District of Delaware, or to Dismiss . (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]
March 30, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court - District of Delaware, or to Dismiss by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer and Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Liza M. Walsh with Exhibits A-G, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]
February 27, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN RUTH MALAKOFF on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (MALAKOFF, LAUREN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]
February 27, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (GANNON, CHRISTINE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]
February 27, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by LIZA M. WALSH on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (WALSH, LIZA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]
February 7, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]
January 31, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]
January 31, 2023 Filing 3 AO120 Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Exhibits) (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]
January 29, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]
January 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13991164) with JURY DEMAND, filed by VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Certification L. Civ. R. 11.2)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/9/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc. v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanda Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Charles H. Seidell
Represented By: Paul W. Hughes
Represented By: Sarah P. Hogarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Monica R. Talley
Represented By: Nathan Roger Hoeschen
Represented By: Chandrika Vira
Represented By: John C. Rozendaal
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?