Moore v. HUB Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher T. Moore
Defendant: Hub Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00044
Filed: January 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2024 Remark: Chambers reached out to Plaintiff's out of town counsel to confirm status on the retention of Delaware local counsel, or if Plaintiff would be proceeding another way. Attorney Joshua Avigad responded and advised his client will be proceeding pro se. Plaintiff's address has been added to the docket. (nms)
February 12, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by John Anderson Sensing on behalf of Hub Group, Inc. (Sensing, John)
January 17, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 12, 2024 Filing 28 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 2/12/2024. (jfm)
January 12, 2024 Filing 27 Record of case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number in Other District: 3:23-cv-02720. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT. The Court DENIES Hub's motion to dismiss Moore's complaint, GRANTS Hub's motion to transfer venue to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware (part of Doc. 17), TRANSFERS this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware and DISCHARGES the Court's October 11, 2023, Order to Show Cause (Doc. 15). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 1/11/2024. (jdh) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
December 20, 2023 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint or Transfer Venue (REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT) filed by HUB Group, Inc.. (Ohlms, Todd) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to File a long reply brief. The defendant shall have three days from this order to electronically file its reply brief. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 12/18/2023. (tlp)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
December 8, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Further Support of Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Complaint or Transfer Venue by HUB Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Hub's Reply ISO Motion to Dismiss or Transfer)(Ohlms, Todd) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
November 30, 2023 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint or Transfer Venue filed by Christopher T Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Christopher Moore, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Tumarino v. Garland, Inc.)(Avigad, Joshua) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
November 1, 2023 Filing 20 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Ohlms, Todd) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
November 1, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE: HUB Group, Inc. was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 347, HUB Group, Inc. shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. Consent due by 11/8/2023. (jle) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
October 31, 2023 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint or Transfer Venue filed by HUB Group, Inc.. (Ohlms, Todd) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
October 31, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint or Transfer Venue by HUB Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Wendy L. Seltzer)(Ohlms, Todd) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
October 31, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Christopher T Moore filed by Christopher T Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Christopher Moore)(Avigad, Joshua) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court GRANTS the motion (Doc. 12) but ORDERS that the defendant shall only have an additional 15 days from the current deadline up to October 31, 2023 to respond to Moore's complaint. The Court ORDERS the plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE on or before October 31, 2023, why the Court should not transfer this case to some other district. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/11/2023. (jdh) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
October 10, 2023 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiff's Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Christopher T Moore. (Avigad, Joshua) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
October 10, 2023 Filing 13 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by All Defendants identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Blackrock Fund Advisors for HUB Group, Inc.. (Ohlms, Todd) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
October 10, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiff's Complaint or Otherwise Plead by All Defendants. (Ohlms, Todd) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
October 10, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing HUB Group, Inc. to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 347, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to HUB Group, Inc. on 10/10/2023. Consent due by 10/31/2023. (jle) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
October 6, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Joseph Ohlms on behalf of All Defendants (Ohlms, Todd) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
August 24, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. HUB Group, Inc. waiver sent on 8/17/2023, answer due 10/16/2023. (Avigad, Joshua) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
August 8, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to HUB Group, Inc. Original mailed to counsel for service. (csb) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
August 8, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Avigad, Joshua) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
August 8, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Avigad on behalf of Christopher T Moore (Avigad, Joshua) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
August 8, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint, Because the required Disclosure Statement was not filed with the attached, this matter is being submitted to the presiding judge for further action. A copy of this Court's form Disclosure Statement can be found at #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (csb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
August 8, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ACTION re #1 Complaint, See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, or transferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Avigad does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (csb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. Modified on 8/8/2023 (csb). [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
August 8, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Christopher T. Moore to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 347, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Christopher T. Moore on 8/8/2023. Consent due by 8/29/2023 (csb) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]
August 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiff Christopher T. Moore v. Hub Group, Inc. against christopher t moore ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-5154741.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Employment Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Avigad, Joshua) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/12/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. HUB Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher T. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hub Group, Inc.
Represented By: John Anderson Sensing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?