Grange Holdings Inc. v. Kansas City Life Insurance Company et al
Counter Defendant: Grange Holdings Inc.
Counter Claimant: Kansas City Life Insurance Company and Grange Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv00160
Filed: February 7, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rachel A. Smoot - filed by Grange Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Sullivan, William)
April 5, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan G. Polak - filed by Grange Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Sullivan, William)
April 5, 2024 Filing 24 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Rachel A. Smoot and Jonathan G. Polak. ( Payment of $ 100, receipt number ADEDC-4378411).(Sullivan, William)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #26 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rachel A. Smoot, filed by Grange Holdings Inc., and #25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan G. Polak, filed by Grange Holdings Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/5/2024. (nms)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/23/2024, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/26/2024. (nms)
March 22, 2024 Filing 22 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIMS against Grange Holdings Inc., by Grange Life Insurance Company, Kansas City Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-7)(Pascale, Karen) Modified on 3/25/2024 (nms).
March 21, 2024 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Kansas City Life Insurance Company for Grange Life Insurance Company filed by Grange Life Insurance Company, Kansas City Life Insurance Company. (Pascale, Karen)
March 21, 2024 Filing 20 Joint Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, by Grange Holdings Inc.. (Sullivan, William) Modified on 3/21/2024 (nms).
March 19, 2024 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Grange Holdings Inc.. (Sullivan, William)
March 18, 2024 DEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court: This case was transferred from the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio on 2/7/2024. As of 3/18/2024, a joint statement pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 has not been filed. A joint statement is now due no later than three (3) days from the date of this notice. (nms)
March 18, 2024 DEFICIENCY NOTICE issued by the Court to Defendants: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (b)(1), A party must: (1) file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Counsel is requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (nms)
March 8, 2024 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against Grange Life Insurance Company and Kansas City Life Insurance Company - filed by Grange Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Redline version)(Sullivan, William) Modified on 3/8/2024 (nms).
March 5, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by William D. Sullivan on behalf of Grange Holdings Inc. (Sullivan, William)
February 14, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Ohio State Law Claims - filed by Grange Life Insurance Company, Kansas City Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Pascale, Karen) Modified on 2/15/2024 (nms).
February 14, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen L. Pascale on behalf of All Defendants (Pascale, Karen)
February 14, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 7, 2024 Filing 14 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/8/2024. (mkr)
February 7, 2024 Filing 13 Record of case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number in Other District: 2:23-cv-03970. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Transfer Action to the District of Delaware. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. Defendants are ORDERED to file a new motion to dismiss to the limited choice of law issue w/in five (5) business days after the docketing of the case in the District of Delaware. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/7/2024. (kk2) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/7/2024.]
February 7, 2024 Case transferred to District of Delaware. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (kk2) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/7/2024.]
February 6, 2024 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Transfer this Action to the District of Delaware by Plaintiff Grange Holdings Inc.. (Smoot, Rachel) Modified on 2/7/2024 to correct filing event (kk2) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/7/2024.]
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court VACATES the Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2024. Should this case remain pending in this District, the parties are ORDERED to submit a proposed case schedule w/in fourteen (14) days of the ruling on Defendants' pending Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #8 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/18/2024. (kk2) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/7/2024.]
January 17, 2024 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Grange Holdings Inc.. (Smoot, Rachel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/7/2024.]
January 16, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss with Memorandum in Support by Defendants Grange Life Insurance Company, Kansas City Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through C to Motion to Dismiss) (Martinez, Traci) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/7/2024.]
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTATION ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ann G. Fort. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 1/10/2024. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/7/2024.]
January 3, 2024 Filing fee for PHV motion filed 12/29/2023: $ 200.00, receipt number AOHSDC-9750439. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/7/2024.]
December 29, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Ann G. Fort by Defendants Grange Life Insurance Company, Kansas City Life Insurance Company. (Martinez, Traci) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/7/2024.]
December 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2024 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/7/2024.]
December 27, 2023 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Defendants Grange Life Insurance Company, Kansas City Life Insurance Company. (Martinez, Traci) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/7/2024.]
December 4, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Grange Life Insurance Company, Kansas City Life Insurance Company. (mas) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/7/2024.]
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Grange Holdings Inc.. (Smoot, Rachel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/7/2024.]
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against Grange Life Insurance Company, Kansas City Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9709760), filed by Grange Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - License Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form to Kansas City Life Insurance, #4 Summons Form to Grange Life Insurance Company) (Smoot, Rachel) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 2/7/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grange Holdings Inc. v. Kansas City Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Grange Holdings Inc.
Represented By: William D. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Kansas City Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Karen L. Pascale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Grange Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Karen L. Pascale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?