Costa et al v. Whirlpool Corporation
Plaintiff: Stacy Costa, Nathaniel Guerrero, Missy Robinson and Leslie LaManna
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Case Number: 1:2024cv00188
Filed: February 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2024 Filing 24 EXHIBIT re #23 Amended Complaint // CLRA Venue Declaration of Plaintiff Leslie Lamanna Pursuant to California Civil Code Section 1780(d) by Stacy Costa, Nathaniel Guerrero, Leslie LaManna, Missy Robinson. (Tucker, Scott) Modified on 4/10/2024 (dlw).
April 9, 2024 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Whirlpool Corporation- filed by Leslie LaManna, Stacy Costa, Nathaniel Guerrero, Missy Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CLRA Venue Declaration of Plaintiff Nathaniel Guerrero Pursuant to California Civil Code Section 1780(d), #2 Exhibit B - CLRA Venue Declaration of Plaintiff Mark Gandara Pursuant to California Civil Code Section 1780(d))(Tucker, Scott)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SO ORDERED re (21 in 1:24-cv-00188-MN, 3 in 1:24-cv-00310-MN) Joint Stipulation and Order to Consolidate Related Action. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/9/2024. (dlw)
April 8, 2024 Filing 21 Joint STIPULATION to Consolidate Related Actions and [Proposed] Order by Stacy Costa, Nathaniel Guerrero, Missy Robinson. (Tucker, Scott) Modified on 4/9/2024 (dlw).
March 12, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Andrew M. Unthank and Jennifer E. Simon for Whirlpool Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
March 11, 2024 Filing 20 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Jennifer E. Simon. ( re #19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer E. Simon, Esq. )( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4358062).(Dalton, Michael)
March 11, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer E. Simon, Esq. - filed by Whirlpool Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Verification Certification of Counsel)(Dalton, Michael)
March 11, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew M. Unthank, Esq. - filed by Whirlpool Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Verification Certification By Counsel)(Dalton, Michael)
March 11, 2024 Filing 17 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Andrew M. Unthank, Esq.. ( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4357989).(Dalton, Michael)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew M. Unthank, Esq. filed by Whirlpool Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/11/2024. (dlw)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #19 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer E. Simon, Esq. filed by Whirlpool Corporation. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/11/2024. (dlw)
March 8, 2024 Filing 16 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Alex M. Kashurba and Marissa N. Pembroke. ( re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alex M. Kashurba, #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marissa N. Pembroke )( Payment of $ 100, receipt number ADEDC-4356985).(Tucker, Scott)
March 8, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marissa N. Pembroke - filed by Stacy Costa, Nathaniel Guerrero, Missy Robinson. (Tucker, Scott)
March 8, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alex M. Kashurba - filed by Stacy Costa, Nathaniel Guerrero, Missy Robinson. (Tucker, Scott)
March 8, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Marissa N. Pembroke and Alex M. Kashurba for Stacy Costa, Nathaniel Guerrero, and Missy Robinson added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mkr)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alex M. Kashurba, #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marissa N. Pembroke filed by Nathaniel Guerrero, Stacy Costa, Missy Robinson. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/8/2024. (dlw)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SO ORDERED re #11 Stipulation and Order Appointing Interim Lead Class Counsel Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(g). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/7/2024. (dlw)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SO ORDERED re #10 Stipulation and Order Setting Amendment and Briefing Schedule - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the stipulation is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint by 4/9/2024. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond 42 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/7/2024. (dlw)
March 6, 2024 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Appointing Interim Lead Class Counsel Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 23(g) by Stacy Costa, Nathaniel Guerrero, Missy Robinson. (Tucker, Scott) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2024: #1 Chimicles Firm Resume) (dlw).
March 6, 2024 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Setting Amendment And Briefing Schedule by Stacy Costa, Nathaniel Guerrero, Missy Robinson. (Tucker, Scott)
March 6, 2024 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Whirlpool Corporation filed by Whirlpool Corporation. (Dalton, Michael)
March 6, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bartholomew J. Dalton on behalf of Whirlpool Corporation (Dalton, Bartholomew)
March 6, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Caulfield Dalton on behalf of Whirlpool Corporation (Dalton, Michael)
February 22, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Zachary P. Beatty and Timothy N. Mathews for Stacy Costa, Nathaniel Guerrero, and Missy Robinson added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mkr)
February 21, 2024 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Timothy N. Mathews and Zachary P. Beatty. ( re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Zachary P. Beatty, #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy N. Mathews )( Payment of $ 100, receipt number ADEDC-4343680).(Tucker, Scott)
February 21, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Zachary P. Beatty - filed by Stacy Costa, Nathaniel Guerrero, Missy Robinson. (Tucker, Scott)
February 21, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy N. Mathews - filed by Stacy Costa, Nathaniel Guerrero, Missy Robinson. (Tucker, Scott)
February 21, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacy Costa, Nathaniel Guerrero, Missy Robinson.Whirlpool Corporation served on 2/20/2024, answer due 3/12/2024. (Tucker, Scott)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Zachary P. Beatty, #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy N. Mathews filed by Nathaniel Guerrero, Stacy Costa, Missy Robinson. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/21/2024. (dlw)
February 14, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 12, 2024 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
February 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Whirlpool Corporation ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4336586.) - filed by Stacy Costa, Nathaniel Guerrero, Missy Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)
February 12, 2024 No Summons Issued. (apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Costa et al v. Whirlpool Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Costa
Represented By: Scott M. Tucker
Represented By: Alex M. Kashurba
Represented By: Marissa N. Pembroke
Represented By: Timothy N. Mathews
Represented By: Zachary P. Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Guerrero
Represented By: Scott M. Tucker
Represented By: Marissa N. Pembroke
Represented By: Alex M. Kashurba
Represented By: Timothy N. Mathews
Represented By: Zachary P. Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missy Robinson
Represented By: Scott M. Tucker
Represented By: Marissa N. Pembroke
Represented By: Timothy N. Mathews
Represented By: Zachary P. Beatty
Represented By: Alex M. Kashurba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie LaManna
Represented By: Peter Bradford deLeeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Andrew M. Unthank
Represented By: Jennifer E. Simon
Represented By: Michael Caulfield Dalton
Represented By: Bartholomew J. Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?