Okhandiar et al v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Krishna Okhandiar and Remilia Corporation LLC
Defendant: Henry Smith, Maxwell Roux and John Duff, III
Case Number: 1:2024cv00193
Filed: February 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
Presiding Judge: Gregory B Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Krishna Okhandiar, Remilia Corporation LLC as to Case (Without Prejudice) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Simon, Christopher)
February 26, 2024 CASE CLOSED (ntl)
February 21, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 19, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by David Gerard Holmes on behalf of Krishna Okhandiar, Remilia Corporation LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Holmes, David)
February 19, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Page Simon on behalf of Krishna Okhandiar, Remilia Corporation LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Simon, Christopher)
February 13, 2024 Filing 27 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/14/2024. (apk)
February 13, 2024 Filing 26 Record of case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number in Other District: 2:23-cv-01409. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting in part #9 Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer. This case is transferred to the District of Delaware for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/12/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
February 8, 2024 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Jonathan P. Hersey re #23 Reply by Defendants John Duff, III, Maxwell Roux, Henry Smith.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Dawn) Modified on 2/9/2024 #9 (WJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
February 8, 2024 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #9 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendants John Duff, III, Maxwell Roux, Henry Smith. (Davis, Dawn) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
February 2, 2024 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #8 Notice re 4m Dismissal, by Plaintiffs Krishna Okhandiar, Remilia Corporation LLC. (Madsen, Bradley) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
February 1, 2024 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiffs Krishna Okhandiar, Remilia Corporation LLC. Replies due by 2/8/2024. (Madsen, Bradley) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lea E. Gierut for John Duff, III, Maxwell Roux, Henry Smith and approving Designation of Local Counsel Dawn L. Davis. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/22/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan P. Hersey for John Duff, III, Maxwell Roux, Henry Smith and approving Designation of Local Counsel Dawn L. Davis. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/22/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
January 22, 2024 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by John Duff, III, Maxwell Roux, Henry Smith. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Davis, Dawn) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Striking Certificate of Interested Parties. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/26/2024. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/19/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
January 19, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Lea E. Gierut and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Dawn Davis (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7559610) by Defendants John Duff, III, Maxwell Roux, Henry Smith. (Davis, Dawn) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
January 19, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan P. Hersey and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Dawn Davis (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7559600) by Defendants John Duff, III, Maxwell Roux, Henry Smith. (Davis, Dawn) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
January 18, 2024 Filing 14 STRICKEN per #17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by John Duff, III, Maxwell Roux, Henry Smith. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Davis, Dawn) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
January 18, 2024 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Henry Smith re #9 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendants John Duff, III, Maxwell Roux, Henry Smith.. (Davis, Dawn) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
January 18, 2024 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Maxwell Roux re #9 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendants John Duff, III, Maxwell Roux, Henry Smith.. (Davis, Dawn) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
January 18, 2024 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Jonathan P. Hersey re #9 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendants John Duff, III, Maxwell Roux, Henry Smith.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Davis, Dawn) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
January 18, 2024 Filing 10 DECLARATION of John Duff III re #9 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendants John Duff, III, Maxwell Roux, Henry Smith.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Davis, Dawn) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
January 18, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendants John Duff, III, Maxwell Roux, Henry Smith. Responses due by 2/1/2024. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/28/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/3/2024. (Davis, Dawn) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
January 5, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * complaint* in this action was filed on* 9/10/2023.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*Henry Smith.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 2/4/2024. (WJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
September 22, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Krishna Okhandiar, Remilia Corporation LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Madsen, Bradley) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
September 20, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Krishna Okhandiar, Remilia Corporation LLC re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. Maxwell Roux served on 9/15/2023. (Madsen, Bradley) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
September 20, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Krishna Okhandiar, Remilia Corporation LLC re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. John Duff, III served on 9/19/2023. (Madsen, Bradley) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiffs' #2 certificate of interested parties is STRICKEN for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2). The certificate does not identify the citizenship of the plaintiffs as required by the amendment to that rule. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the plaintiffs to file a proper certificate of interested parties by September 22, 2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/22/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
September 12, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Duff, III, Maxwell Roux, Henry Smith re #1 Complaint. (RGDG) [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
September 11, 2023 Filing 2 STRICKEN on 9/13/23 per #4 Order. (RGDG) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Krishna Okhandiar, Remilia Corporation LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Madsen, Bradley) Modified on 9/13/2023 (RGDG). [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]
September 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number BNVDC-7421337) by Krishna Okhandiar, Remilia Corporation LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/20/2023. Proof of service due by 12/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Madsen, Bradley) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 2/13/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Okhandiar et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krishna Okhandiar
Represented By: Christopher Page Simon
Represented By: David Gerard Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Remilia Corporation LLC
Represented By: Christopher Page Simon
Represented By: David Gerard Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxwell Roux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Duff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?