United States of America v. Real Property Located at 28 Merritt Trace, Brunswick, GA 31525
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located at 28 Merritt Trace, Brunswick, GA 31525
Claimant: Dante Fredrick and Asaad Amir Hasuan
Case Number: 1:2024cv00246
Filed: February 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Hall
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property - Real Estate
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Third Circuit re #8 Notice of Appeal to the Third Circuit filed by Dante Fredrick. USCA Case Number 24-1534. USCA Case Manager: Laurie (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (lr)
March 20, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Access to Court - filed by Dante Fredrick. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(smg)
March 20, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel - filed by Dante Fredrick. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(smg)
March 20, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Third Circuit of D.I. #7 Protective Order. Appeal filed by Dante Fredrick. (No IFP, No Fee Paid) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(smg) (Main Document 8 replaced on 3/20/2024) (smg).
February 28, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 23, 2024 Case Stayed per #6 Order. (ceg)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 02/23/2024. (smg)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 [SEALED] ORDER Granting D.I. #1 MOTION for Stay and to Seal Verified Complaint In Rem. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 02/23/2024.This order has been emailed to local counsel. (smg)
February 23, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for a Post-Complaint Protective Order to Secure, Maintain and Preserve the Availability of the Defendant Property for Forfeiture - filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(smg)
February 23, 2024 Filing 4 REDACTED VERSION of D.I. #2 VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem by United States of America. (smg)
February 23, 2024 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg)
February 23, 2024 Filing 2 [SEALED] VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem - filed against Real Property Located at 28 Merritt Trace, Brunswick, GA 31525 (Filing Fee Waived)- filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg)
February 23, 2024 Filing 1 [SEALED] MOTION for Stay and to Seal Verified Complaint In Rem - filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(smg)
February 23, 2024 No Summons Issued. (smg)
February 23, 2024 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (smg)
February 23, 2024 Remark: Exit copies to Duty Judge CFC. (smg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located at 28 Merritt Trace, Brunswick, GA 31525
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Claudia L. Pare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 28 Merritt Trace, Brunswick, GA 31525
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dante Fredrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Asaad Amir Hasuan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?