Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH et al v. BendaRx USA Corp
Plaintiff: Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH, Cephalon, LLC and Eagle Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant: BendaRx USA Corp
Case Number: 1:2024cv00395
Filed: March 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Hall
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 82 SO ORDERED, re #81 Joint Stipulation and Order of Consolidation with C.A. 23-490-JLH. Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 4/15/2024. (ceg)
April 15, 2024 Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:23-cv-00490-JLH. ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 1:23-cv-00490-JLH ONLY. (ceg)
April 10, 2024 Filing 81 Joint STIPULATION and Proposed Order of Consolidation and Statement Pursuant to Rule 81.2 by Cephalon, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Hoeschen, Nathan)
April 3, 2024 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Elizabeth Keller on behalf of Cephalon, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH (Keller, Karen)
April 3, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 1, 2024 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of Eagle Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Joyce, Alexandra)
April 1, 2024 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Silver on behalf of Eagle Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Silver, Daniel)
March 28, 2024 Filing 77 Local Counsel Letter sent via mail. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 04/29/2024. (mrr)
March 28, 2024 Filing 76 Record of case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 1:23-cv-00788. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #73 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 3/27/2024. (swil) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
March 26, 2024 Filing 74 Memorandum in Support re #73 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Cephalon, LLC, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
March 26, 2024 Filing 73 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case by Cephalon, LLC, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
March 19, 2024 Filing 72 STATUS REPORT by Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 71 It is hereby ORDERED that the parties Motion for Extension of Time is granted. The Parties' Joint Status Report shall be due no later than March 19, 2024 re #70 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 3/13/2024. (Sbro) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
March 12, 2024 Filing 70 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Status Report by Cephalon, LLC, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
January 12, 2024 Filing 69 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Cephalon, LLC, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
November 13, 2023 Filing 68 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by BendaRx USA Corp. (Bagley, Andrew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
September 14, 2023 Filing 67 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Cephalon, LLC, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDERED that the parties' respective Motions to Seal Exhibit B to Plaintiffs' Memorandum (Dkts. 24, 64) are GRANTED and the redacted portions of Exhibit B shall remain permanently under seal; it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Exhibit A is deemed WITHDRAWN (see Order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 8/29/2023. (Dest) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
August 21, 2023 Filing 65 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and B to Motion to Stay (Defendant's Supplemental Response) filed by BendaRx USA Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (redacted))(Pond, Joshua) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
August 21, 2023 Filing 64 MOTION to Seal by BendaRx USA Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pond, Joshua) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
August 21, 2023 Filing 63 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by BendaRx USA Corp re #23 Memorandum in Support,, portions of Exhibit B (Pond, Joshua) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDERED that the Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Motion to Seal #60 is DISMISSED as moot; it is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file further argument in support of the Motion to Seal #24 , consistent with the requirements of Local Civil Rule 5(C), within seven (7) days of entry of this Order and, if appropriate, an updated redacted version of Exhibit B; it is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file a publicly available version of Exhibit A; it is further ORDERED that Exhibit B shall remain sealed pending a determination by the Court on the Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 8/14/2023. (tran, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
August 2, 2023 Filing 61 RESPONSE to Motion re #24 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and B to Motion to Stay filed by BendaRx USA Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (Redacted), #2 Proposed Order)(Pond, Joshua) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
August 2, 2023 Filing 60 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and B to Motion to Stay by BendaRx USA Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pond, Joshua) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #47 Motion to Seal. ORDERED that Dkt. 49 shall remain sealed; it is further ORDERED that Defendant shall submit a response to Plaintiff's Motion to Seal (Dkt. 24), complying with the requirements under Local Civil Rule 7(C), within 7 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 07/21/2023. (wgar, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDERED that the parties shall contact the undersigned's chambers within 14 days of the stay being lifted, to schedule a status conference regarding the adoption of a discovery plan and the entry of a discovery order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 7/21/2023. (swil) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/19/2023. Appearance of counsel. Proposed Discovery Plan discussed in open court. Shortly after the IPC, Judge Alston issued an order staying this entire case. Therefore, a Rule 16(b) order will not be issued by Judge Fitzpatrick-per WEF chambers. (Tape #FTR.)(tfitz, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Stay. ORDERED that this matter is STAYED until Final Judgment or order in each of Case Nos. 23-cv-490-CFC (D. Del) and 23-cv-633-CFC (D. Del.). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 07/19/2023. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Ben Picozzi for Cephalon, LLC,Ben Picozzi for Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 7/18/2023. (swil) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 17, 2023 Filing 54 Reply to Motion re #22 MOTION to Stay filed by Cephalon, LLC, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit X, #2 Exhibit Y)(Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 17, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua B Pond on behalf of BendaRx USA Corp (Pond, Joshua) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 13, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE by BendaRx USA Corp re #46 Memorandum in Opposition, Corrected Exhibit H to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay (Bagley, Andrew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 51 Proposed Joint Discovery Plan by Cephalon, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH.(Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE by BendaRx USA Corp re #47 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay (Bagley, Andrew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 49 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #47 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay. (Bagley, Andrew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 48 Memorandum in Support re #47 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay filed by BendaRx USA Corp. (Bagley, Andrew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 47 MOTION to Seal Exhibit B to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay by BendaRx USA Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bagley, Andrew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 12, 2023 Filing 46 Memorandum in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Stay filed by BendaRx USA Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Bagley, Andrew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 11, 2023 Filing 45 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ben Picozzi and Certification of Local Counsel Maya Eckstein Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9019245. by Cephalon, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDERED, that Defendant shall file a brief in response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay (ECF Nos. 22, 23) by July 12, 2023, and Plaintiffs shall file a reply brief in support of the Motion to Stay by July 17, 2023 in re #41 Consent MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule with Respect to Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 7/10/2023. (swil) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 7, 2023 Filing 43 STIPULATION re #11 Scheduling Order, by Cephalon, LLC, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 7, 2023 Filing 42 Notice of Hearing Date set for 7/19/2023 re #22 MOTION to Stay , #23 Memorandum in Support,, (Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 7, 2023 Filing 41 Consent MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule with Respect to Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay by Cephalon, LLC, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 6, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE by Cephalon, LLC, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH re #27 Notice of Hearing Date Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Hearing Date (Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 6, 2023 Filing 39 Notice of Under Seal Filing LCvR5 (B) by Cephalon, LLC, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH re #24 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and B to Motion to Stay, #25 Memorandum in Support (Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 6, 2023 Filing 38 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Remus and Certification of Local Counsel Andrew W. Bagley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9014072. by BendaRx USA Corp. (Bagley, Andrew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 6, 2023 Filing 37 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Shannon Marie Lentz and Certification of Local Counsel Andrew W. Bagley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9014003. by BendaRx USA Corp. (Bagley, Andrew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 6, 2023 Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified to refile the notice of hearing which requests a Wednesday date in re #27 Notice of Hearing Date. (wgar, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 6, 2023 Notice of Correction re #26 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s). The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Under Seal filing LCvR5 (B). (Sbro) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Kenneth Schuler for Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 7/5/2023. (swil) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Alex Grabowski for Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 7/5/2023. (swil) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Marc Nathan Zubick for Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 7/5/2023. (swil) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Daniel Brown for Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 7/5/2023. (swil) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Anne Elise Herold Li for BendaRx USA Corp. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 7/5/2023. (swil) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Elise Michelle Baumgarten for Cephalon, LLC,Elise Michelle Baumgarten for Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 7/5/2023. (swil) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed David Issac Berl for Cephalon, LLC,David Issac Berl for Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 7/5/2023. (swil) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Adam Daniel Harber for Cephalon, LLC,Adam Daniel Harber for Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 7/5/2023. (swil) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #13 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 7/5/2023. (swil) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 5, 2023 Filing 27 Notice of Hearing Date set for 07/14/2023 re #22 MOTION to Stay , #23 Memorandum in Support,, (Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 5, 2023 Filing 26 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #24 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and B to Motion to Stay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex.A, #2 Exhibit Ex.B)(Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 5, 2023 Filing 25 Memorandum in Support re #24 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and B to Motion to Stay filed by Cephalon, LLC, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 5, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION to Seal Exhibits A and B to Motion to Stay by Cephalon, LLC, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 5, 2023 Filing 23 Memorandum in Support re #22 MOTION to Stay filed by Cephalon, LLC, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex.A-Under Seal, #2 Exhibit Ex.B.-Under Seal, #3 Exhibit Ex.C, #4 Exhibit Ex.D, #5 Exhibit Ex.E, #6 Exhibit Ex.F, #7 Exhibit Ex.G, #8 Exhibit Ex.L, #9 Exhibit Ex.N, #10 Exhibit Ex.O, #11 Exhibit Ex.P, #12 Exhibit Ex.Q, #13 Exhibit Ex.R, #14 Exhibit Ex.S, #15 Exhibit Ex.T, #16 Exhibit Ex.U, #17 Exhibit Ex.V, #18 Exhibit Ex.W)(Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
July 5, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay by Cephalon, LLC, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 27, 2023 Filing 21 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth Schuler and Certification of Local Counsel Eden Darrell Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9000599. by Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Darrell, Eden) (Main Document 21 replaced on 6/29/2023) (wgar, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 27, 2023 Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Alex Grabowski and Certification of Local Counsel Eden Darrell Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9000591. by Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Darrell, Eden) (Main Document 20 replaced on 6/29/2023) (wgar, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 27, 2023 Filing 19 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Marc Zubick and Certification of Local Counsel Eden Darrell Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9000570. by Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Darrell, Eden) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 27, 2023 Filing 18 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Brown and Certification of Local Counsel Eden Darrell Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9000550. by Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Darrell, Eden) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 23, 2023 Filing 17 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Anne Elise Herold Li and Certification of Local Counsel Andrew W. Bagley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8995824. by BendaRx USA Corp. (Bagley, Andrew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 23, 2023 Filing 16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Elise Baumgarten and Certification of Local Counsel Maya Eckstein Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8995802. by Cephalon, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 23, 2023 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David Berl and Certification of Local Counsel Maya Eckstein Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8995790. by Cephalon, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 23, 2023 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam Harber and Certification of Local Counsel Maya Eckstein Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8995779. by Cephalon, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 23, 2023 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ben Picozzi and Certification of Local Counsel Maya Eckstein Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8995744. by Cephalon, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 22, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Eden Marie Darrell on behalf of Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Darrell, Eden) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/19/2023 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick.Discovery due by 10/13/2023.Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 06/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice)(tran) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 21, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by BendaRx USA Corp.(Bagley, Andrew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 21, 2023 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by BendaRx USA Corp. (Bagley, Andrew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 21, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Bagley on behalf of BendaRx USA Corp (Bagley, Andrew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 20, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by Cephalon, LLC, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH re #1 Complaint, Report onthe filing or Determination of an Action regarding a Patent or Trademark (Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 20, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BendaRx USA Corp, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(Sbro) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 16, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Darrell, Eden) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 16, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by Cephalon, LLC, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Eckstein, Maya) (Main Document 3 replaced to correct summons on 6/20/2023) (Sbro). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 16, 2023 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Cephalon, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH. (Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]
June 16, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8986443.), filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH, Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cephalon, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex.A, #3 Exhibit Ex.B, #4 Exhibit Ex.C, #5 Exhibit Ex.D, #6 Exhibit Ex.E, #7 Exhibit Ex.F, #8 Exhibit Ex.G, #9 Exhibit Ex.H, #10 Exhibit Ex.I, #11 Exhibit Ex.J, #12 Exhibit Ex.K)(Eckstein, Maya) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 3/28/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH et al v. BendaRx USA Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cephalon, LLC
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eagle Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BendaRx USA Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?