Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Hetero Labs Limited et al
Plaintiff: Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC and Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
Defendant: Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V and Hetero USA Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00396
Filed: March 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Maliheh Zare on behalf of Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited (Zare, Maliheh)
May 1, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Alexandra Joyce as co-counsel. Reason for request: No Longer Counsel of Record. (Joyce, Alexandra)
April 11, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sarah E. Spencer for Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC and Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (oam)
April 11, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Christopher P. Hill for Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC and Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (oam)
April 11, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Chad J. Peterman for Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC,and Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (oam)
April 11, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael F. Werno for Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC and Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (oam)
April 8, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bruce M. Wexler for Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC and Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (oam)
April 8, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Zhiqiang Liu for Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (vfm)
April 5, 2024 Filing 12 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Bruce M. Wexler, Chad J. Peterman, Christopher P. Hill, Michael F. Werno, and Sarah E. Spencer. ( re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce M. Wexler, Chad J. Peterman, Christopher P. Hill, Michael F. Werno, and Sarah E. Spencer )( Payment of $ 250, receipt number ADEDC-4378251).(Joyce, Alexandra)
April 5, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce M. Wexler, Chad J. Peterman, Christopher P. Hill, Michael F. Werno, and Sarah E. Spencer - filed by Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Bruce M. Wexler, Chad J. Peterman, Christopher P. Hill, Michael F. Werno, and Sarah E. Spencer)(Joyce, Alexandra)
April 5, 2024 Filing 10 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for William F. Cavanaugh, Jr. and Zhiqiang Liu. ( re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William F. Cavanaugh, Jr. and Zhiqiang Liu )( Payment of $ 100, receipt number ADEDC-4378089).(Joyce, Alexandra)
April 5, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William F. Cavanaugh, Jr. and Zhiqiang Liu - filed by Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for William F. Cavanaugh, Jr. and Zhiqiang Liu)(Joyce, Alexandra)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bruce M. Wexler, Chad J. Peterman, Christopher P. Hill, Michael F. Werno, and Sarah E. Spencer filed by Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/5/2024. (dlw)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William F. Cavanaugh, Jr. and Zhiqiang Liu filed by Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/5/2024. (dlw)
April 3, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 28, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Hetero Labs Limited on 3/28/2024; Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V on 3/28/2024; Hetero USA Inc. on 3/28/2024. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Hetero USA Inc, #2 Summons Issued Hetero Labs Limited) (vfm)
March 28, 2024 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Master Trust Bank of Japan, Ltd. for Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited filed by Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited. (vfm)
March 28, 2024 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent CutisPharma Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (vfm)
March 28, 2024 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Arbor Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Other Affiliate Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC filed by Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (vfm)
March 28, 2024 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,066,936. (vfm)
March 28, 2024 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 02/16/2024. Date of Expiration of Patent: 03/26/2028.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 8/16/2026. (vfm)
March 28, 2024 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (vfm)
March 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for ANDA/PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Hetero Labs Limited, Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V, Hetero USA Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4372453.) - filed by Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (vfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Hetero Labs Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azurity Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Bruce M. Wexler
Represented By: Chad J. Peterman
Represented By: Christopher P. Hill
Represented By: Maliheh Zare
Represented By: Michael F. Werno
Represented By: Sarah E. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arbor Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Bruce M. Wexler
Represented By: Chad J. Peterman
Represented By: Christopher P. Hill
Represented By: Maliheh Zare
Represented By: Michael F. Werno
Represented By: Sarah E. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Maliheh Zare
Represented By: Zhiqiang Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero Labs Limited Unit-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hetero USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?