Bayer HealthCare LLC et al v. Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Bayer HealthCare LLC and Meda Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00399
Filed: March 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Gregory B Williams
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 1 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2024 Filing 9 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (lnb)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Meda Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 5/23/2024. (lnb)
May 22, 2024 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal (without prejudice) - by Bayer HealthCare LLC, Meda Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Fahnestock, Derek)
April 3, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 29, 2024 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Viatris Inc. for Meda Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Meda Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Cordo, Andrew)
March 28, 2024 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. and Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. on 3/28/2024. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.)(jfm)
March 28, 2024 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer HealthCare LLC filed by Bayer HealthCare LLC. (jfm)
March 28, 2024 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,071,073 B2; 8,518,919 B2; 9,919,050 B2. (jfm)
March 28, 2024 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 02/14/2024. Date of Expiration of Patent: See Attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 8/14/2026. (jfm)
March 28, 2024 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm)
March 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4372777.) - filed by Bayer HealthCare LLC, Meda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayer HealthCare LLC et al v. Aurobindo Pharma Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayer HealthCare LLC
Represented By: Andrew Dieter Cordo
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meda Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Dieter Cordo
Represented By: Derek James Fahnestock
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?