XR10 Capital, LLC v. Reinhart
Plaintiff: XR10 Capital, LLC
Defendant: Nickolas L. Reinhart
Case Number: 1:2024cv00401
Filed: March 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2024 Filing 15 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by XR10 Capital, LLC. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/19/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Certificate of Service)(Donaldson, Richard) Modified on 4/5/2024 (nms).
April 5, 2024 Filing 14 [SEALED] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - filed by XR10 Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 7.1.1 Certification, #3 Certificate of Service)(Donaldson, Richard) Modified on 4/5/2024 (nms).
April 5, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Seal Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Supporting Documents - filed by XR10 Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Donaldson, Richard) Modified on 4/5/2024 (nms).
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORAL ORDER: The redacted filing (D.I. #10 ) is REJECTED because parts of it are redacted in its entirety. Absent a compelling reason, supported by a statement under oath by a party, redactions in their entirety are impermissible; redactions must be done so as to redact the least possible amount of the materials submitted. Failure to make a good faith attempt at such redactions may result in sanctions, the most common of which would be simply unsealing the entire filing. Redacting in its entirety a document, or parts of it, that contains publicly available materials is prima facie evidence of bad faith. A revised redacted filing is DUE within five business days. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/5/2024. (nms)
April 4, 2024 Filing 11 REDACTED VERSION of #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, by XR10 Capital, LLC. (Rosca, Stefania) Modified on 4/5/2024 (nms).
April 4, 2024 Filing 10 REDACTED VERSION of #2 Complaint, by XR10 Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosca, Stefania) Modified on 4/5/2024 (nms).
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy J. Pastore, filed by XR10 Capital, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/4/2024. (nms)
April 3, 2024 Filing 9 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Timothy J. Pastore. ( re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy J. Pastore )( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4376810).(Donaldson, Richard)
April 3, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Timothy J. Pastore - filed by XR10 Capital, LLC. (Donaldson, Richard)
April 3, 2024 CORRECTING ENTRY: The notice of appearance filed as an attachment to the Complaint at D.I. #2 has been removed from that entry. The notice has been refiled at D.I. #7 . (nms)
April 3, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #1 MOTION to Seal the Complaint, Exhibit and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/2/2024. (mpb) Modified on 4/3/2024 (nms).
April 2, 2024 Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (mpb)
April 2, 2024 Remark: Exit Electronic copies to Duty Judge (RGA). (mpb)
March 28, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Montgomery Donaldson and Stefania A. Rosca on behalf of XR10 Capital, LLC. (nms)
March 28, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nickolas L. Reinhart on 3/28/2024. (mpb)
March 28, 2024 Filing 4 [SEALED] Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 - filed by XR10 Capital, LLC. (mpb)
March 28, 2024 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb)
March 28, 2024 Filing 2 [SEALED] Complaint filed against Nickolas L. Reinhart (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4373112) - filed by XR10 Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mpb) Modified on 4/3/2024 (nms).
March 28, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION to Seal the Complaint, Exhibit and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement - filed by XR10 Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(mpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XR10 Capital, LLC v. Reinhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XR10 Capital, LLC
Represented By: Richard Montgomery Donaldson
Represented By: Stefania A. Rosca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nickolas L. Reinhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?