Horizon Therapeutics U.S. Holding LLC et al v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Plaintiff: Horizon Therapeutics U.S. Holding LLC and Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc.
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00432
Filed: April 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Gregory B Williams
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel, Taylor E. Hallowell by Horizon Therapeutics U.S. Holding LLC, Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc. (Higgins, James)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to move, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 7, 2024 filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 4/25/2024. (Brown, Lisa)
April 24, 2024 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to move, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 7, 2024 - filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
April 18, 2024 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Teva Pharmaceuticals, Inc on 04/18/2024, filed by Horizon Therapeutics U.S. Holding LLC, Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc.. (Sharp, Melanie)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorneys Christine Ranney, Esq., Josh Krevitt, Esq., Wayne Barsky, Esq., and Andrew Blythe, Esq. filed by Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics U.S. Holding LLC. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 4/11/24. (ntl)
April 10, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 5, 2024 Filing 9 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Christine Ranney, Josh Krevitt, Wayne Barsky, and Andrew Blythe. ( re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney )( Payment of $ 200, receipt number ADEDC-4378803).(Sharp, Melanie)
April 5, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorneys Christine Ranney, Esq., Josh Krevitt, Esq., Wayne Barsky, Esq., and Andrew Blythe, Esq. - filed by Horizon Therapeutics U.S. Holding LLC, Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc.(oam)
April 5, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Teva Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 4/5/2024. (oam)
April 5, 2024 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Amgen Inc. for Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc. filed by Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc.. (oam)
April 5, 2024 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc. for Horizon Therapeutics U.S. Holding LLC filed by Horizon Therapeutics U.S. Holding LLC. (oam)
April 5, 2024 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) (SEE ATTACHED)(oam).
April 5, 2024 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 02/22/2024. Date of Expiration of Patent: 09/22/2030.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 8/22/2026. (oam)
April 5, 2024 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (oam)
April 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed for PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Teva Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4378505.) - filed by Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc., Horizon Therapeutics U.S. Holding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(oam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horizon Therapeutics U.S. Holding LLC et al v. Teva Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horizon Therapeutics U.S. Holding LLC
Represented By: James L. Higgins
Represented By: Taylor E. Hallowell
Represented By: Melanie K. Sharp
Represented By: Stephanie Vangellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horizon Therapeutics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Melanie K. Sharp
Represented By: James L. Higgins
Represented By: Stephanie Vangellow
Represented By: Taylor E. Hallowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?