Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd. v. Gland Pharma Limited
Plaintiff: Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Defendant: Gland Pharma Limited
Case Number: 1:2024cv00434
Filed: April 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Hall
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey S. Ward for Gland Pharma Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
April 18, 2024 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 1, 2024 - filed by Gland Pharma Limited. (Gattuso, Dominick)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 1, 2024. (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Gland Pharma Limited answer due 7/1/2024). Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 4/18/2024. (ceg)
April 12, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Emer Simic for Gland Pharma Limited added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (vfm)
April 12, 2024 Filing 12 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Jeffrey S. Ward and Emer L. Simic. ( re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey S. Ward and Emer L. Simic of Neal Gerber & Eisenberg LLP )( Payment of $ 100, receipt number ADEDC-4383161).(Gattuso, Dominick)
April 12, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey S. Ward and Emer L. Simic of Neal Gerber & Eisenberg LLP - filed by Gland Pharma Limited. (Gattuso, Dominick)
April 12, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Dominick T. Gattuso on behalf of Gland Pharma Limited (Gattuso, Dominick)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey S. Ward and Emer L. Simic of Neal Gerber & Eisenberg LLP filed by Gland Pharma Limited. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 4/12/2024. (ceg)
April 10, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and related papers served on Gland Pharma Limited on April 9, 2024, filed by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason G. Sheasby and Lisa S. Glasser filed by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd. Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 4/10/2024. (ceg)
April 10, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 8, 2024 Filing 8 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Jason G. Sheasby and Lisa S. Glasser. ( re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason G. Sheasby and Lisa S. Glasser )( Payment of $ 100, receipt number ADEDC-4379163).(Tigan, Jeremy)
April 5, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Gland Pharma Limited on 4/5/2024. (apk)
April 5, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jason G. Sheasby and Lisa S. Glasser - filed by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd. (apk)
April 5, 2024 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd. filed by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd. (apk)
April 5, 2024 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,598,227 B2. (apk)
April 5, 2024 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 2/23/2024. Date of Expiration of Patent: 2/2/2027.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 8/23/2026. (apk)
April 5, 2024 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
April 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Gland Pharma Limited (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4378886.) - filed by Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd. v. Gland Pharma Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Actelion Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gland Pharma Limited
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Ward
Represented By: Dominick T. Gattuso
Represented By: Emer Simic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?