Pfizer Inc. et al v. Biocon Limited et al
Plaintiff: Pfizer Inc., C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., PF PRISM C.V., PF PRISM IMB B.V. and PBG Puerto Rico LLC
Defendant: Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma Limited and Biocon Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00757
Filed: June 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2024 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to September 9, 2024 - filed by Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma Limited, Biocon Pharma, Inc.. (Myer, R.)
July 11, 2024 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Biocon Pharma, Inc. to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to August 26, 2024 - filed by Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma Limited, Biocon Pharma, Inc.. (Myer, R.)
July 11, 2024 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Biocon Limited for Biocon Pharma Limited; Corporate Parent Biocon Pharma Limited for Biocon Pharma, Inc. filed by Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma Limited, Biocon Pharma, Inc.. (Myer, R.)
July 11, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Touhey Myer on behalf of Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma Limited, Biocon Pharma, Inc. (Myer, R.)
July 11, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Biocon Pharma, Inc. to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to August 26, 2024 filed by Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma, Inc., Biocon Pharma Limited. Reset Answer Deadlines: Biocon Pharma, Inc. answer due 8/26/2024. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/11/2024. (kmd)
July 3, 2024 Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES (nmf)
July 3, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 1, 2024 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by PF PRISM C.V., C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., Pfizer Inc., PBG Puerto Rico LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V.: For Biocon Pharma Limited waiver sent on 6/27/2024, answer due 8/26/2024. (Dellinger, Megan)
July 1, 2024 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by PF PRISM C.V., C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., Pfizer Inc., PBG Puerto Rico LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V.: For Biocon Limited waiver sent on 6/27/2024, answer due 8/26/2024. (Dellinger, Megan)
June 27, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PF PRISM C.V., C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., Pfizer Inc., PBG Puerto Rico LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V..Biocon Pharma, Inc. served on 6/27/2024, answer due 7/18/2024. (Dellinger, Megan)
June 26, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Biocon Limited on 6/26/2024; Biocon Pharma Limited on 6/26/2024; Biocon Pharma, Inc. on 6/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Summons Issued)(apk)
June 26, 2024 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer Inc. for C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., PBG Puerto Rico LLC, PF PRISM C.V., PF PRISM IMB B.V. filed by C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., PBG Puerto Rico LLC, PF PRISM C.V., PF PRISM IMB B.V., Pfizer Inc. (apk)
June 26, 2024 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE41,783 E. (apk)
June 26, 2024 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 5/14/2024. Date of Expiration of Patent: 12/8/2025. (apk)
June 26, 2024 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk)
June 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Biocon Limited, Biocon Pharma Limited, Biocon Pharma, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4439096.) - filed by PF PRISM C.V., C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., Pfizer Inc., PBG Puerto Rico LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pfizer Inc. et al v. Biocon Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biocon Limited
Represented By: R. Touhey Myer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biocon Pharma Limited
Represented By: R. Touhey Myer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biocon Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: R. Touhey Myer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V.
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PF PRISM C.V.
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PF PRISM IMB B.V.
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PBG Puerto Rico LLC
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?