Dunlop v. Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sally Cannon Dunlop and Adam Budd
Defendant: Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00946
Filed: August 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Gregory B Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2024 Filing 18 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/25/2024. (Brannigan, Patrick)
October 11, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brannigan, Patrick)
October 11, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kenneth J. Grunfeld for Adam Budd and Sally Cannon Dunlop added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (scs)
October 11, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth J.Grunfeld filed by Sally Cannon Dunlop, Adam Budd. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/11/2024. (lnb)
October 10, 2024 Filing 16 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Kenneth J. Grunfeld. ( re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth J.Grunfeld )( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4520696).(Roland, Dean)
October 10, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #13 Stipulation to Extend Page Limitations filed by Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/10/2024. (lnb)
October 10, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paulyne Gardner filed by Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/10/2024. (lnb)
October 9, 2024 Filing 15 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Paulyne Gardner. ( re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paulyne Gardner )( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4519699).(Brannigan, Patrick)
October 9, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paulyne Gardner - filed by Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.. (Brannigan, Patrick)
October 9, 2024 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend Page Limitations by Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.. (Brannigan, Patrick)
October 8, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth J.Grunfeld - filed by Adam Budd, Sally Cannon Dunlop. (Roland, Dean)
September 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Amended Complaint to October 11, 2024 filed by Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 9/5/2024. (lnb)
September 4, 2024 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Amended Complaint to October 11, 2024 - filed by Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.. (Brannigan, Patrick)
September 4, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Brannigan on behalf of Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc. (Brannigan, Patrick)
August 28, 2024 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT) against Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.- filed by Sally Cannon Dunlop, Adam Budd. (Attachments: #1 Redline)(Roland, Dean)
August 23, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Cassandra P. Miller and Raina C. Borrelli for Sally Cannon Dunlop added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
August 23, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Raina C. Borrelli filed by Sally Cannon Dunlop. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 8/23/2024. (lnb)
August 23, 2024 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cassandra P. Miller filed by Sally Cannon Dunlop. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 8/23/2024. (lnb)
August 22, 2024 Filing 7 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Cassandra P. Miller. ( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4482279).(Roland, Dean)
August 22, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cassandra P. Miller - filed by Sally Cannon Dunlop. (Roland, Dean)
August 22, 2024 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Raina C. Borrelli. ( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4481995).(Roland, Dean)
August 22, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Raina C. Borrelli - filed by Sally Cannon Dunlop. (Roland, Dean)
August 21, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 15, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sally Cannon Dunlop.Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc. served on 8/15/2024, answer due 9/5/2024. (Roland, Dean)
August 14, 2024 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (vfm)
August 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4476250.) - filed by Sally Cannon Dunlop. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (vfm)
August 14, 2024 No Summons Issued. (vfm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunlop v. Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Cannon Dunlop
Represented By: Robert Grant Dick, IV
Represented By: Dean R. Roland
Represented By: Raina C. Borrelli
Represented By: Kenneth J. Grunfeld
Represented By: Cassandra P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Budd
Represented By: Dean R. Roland
Represented By: Kenneth J. Grunfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayhealth Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Brannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?