Pfizer Inc. et al v. Alkem Laboratories Limited
Plaintiff: PBG Puerto Rico LLC, C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., Pfizer Inc., PF PRISM C.V. and PF PRISM IMB B.V.
Defendant: Alkem Laboratories Limited
Case Number: 1:2024cv01427
Filed: December 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Colm F Connolly
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2025 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Pfizer Inc., C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., PBG Puerto Rico LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V., PF PRISM C.V.: For Alkem Laboratories Limited waiver sent on 1/29/2025, answer due 3/31/2025. (Dellinger, Megan)
January 3, 2025 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES. (mws)
January 2, 2025 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
December 30, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Alkem Laboratories Limited on 12/30/2024. (scs)
December 30, 2024 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer Inc. for C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., PBG Puerto Rico LLC, PF PRISM C.V., PF PRISM IMB B.V. filed by Pfizer Inc., C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., PF PRISM C.V., PBG Puerto Rico LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V.. (scs)
December 30, 2024 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE41,783 E. (scs)
December 30, 2024 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 11/18/2024. Date of Expiration of Patent: 12/08/2025. 30 Month Stay: Upon Expiration of Patent. (scs)
December 30, 2024 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (scs)
December 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alkem Laboratories Limited (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4579770) - filed by Pfizer Inc., C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V., PBG Puerto Rico LLC, PF PRISM IMB B.V., PF PRISM C.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(scs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pfizer Inc. et al v. Alkem Laboratories Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PBG Puerto Rico LLC
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.P. Pharmaceuticals International C.V.
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PF PRISM C.V.
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PF PRISM IMB B.V.
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alkem Laboratories Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?