Roberts et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Roberts, Wayne Allen, Michelle Beebe, Severiano Celaya, Norberto Corona, III, Dakota Davis, Ivan Donev, Kevin Harner, Julie Jensen, Monique Newman, Michael Power, Kimbel Ritch, Felipe Soltero, James Swift and Stephen Torres
Defendant: 3M Company, EIDP, Inc., Dupont De Nemours, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co., E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Corteva, Inc., DowDupont, Inc., Allied Signal Inc., AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., Archroma U.S., Inc., Arkema Inc., BASF Corporation, Clariant Corporation, Daikin America, Inc. and Solvay Specialty Polymers USA, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2025cv00184
Filed: February 14, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Unopposed Motion to Stay (D.I. #13 ) is GRANTED. This case is stayed until after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a ruling on Defendants pending motion to transfer this case to the IN RE: Aqueous Film Forming Foams (AFFF) Products Liability Litigation multidistrict litigation and/or until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/21/2025. (nms)
March 20, 2025 Filing 13 Unopposed Motion to Stay Entire Case Pending JPML Decision on Transfer - filed by 3M Company. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 3/20/2025 (nms).
March 20, 2025 Filing 12 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (D.I. #8 ) - filed by Wayne Allen, Michelle Beebe, Severiano Celaya, Norberto Corona, III, Dakota Davis, Ivan Donev, Kevin Harner, Julie Jensen, Monique Newman, Michael Power, Kimbel Ritch, Brenda Roberts, Felipe Soltero, James Swift, Stephen Torres. (Crumplar, Thomas) Modified on 3/20/2025 (nms).
March 20, 2025 CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. #12 has been recoded and the docket text corrected to reflect that the filing is a Notice and not a Motion. (nms)
March 14, 2025 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:25-cv-00181-RGA, 1:25-cv-00183-RGA, 1:25-cv-00184-RGA (rjb)
March 11, 2025 Filing 11 Letter to Hon. Jennifer L. Hall from Thomas C. Crumplar regarding Related Cases - re #10 Letter. (Crumplar, Thomas)
March 11, 2025 Filing 10 Letter to the Honorable Jennifer L. Hall from Kelly E. Farnan regarding Related Cases. (Farnan, Kelly)
March 7, 2025 Filing 9 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #8 MOTION to Remand, filed by Wayne Allen, Michelle Beebe, Severiano Celaya, Norberto Corona, III, Dakota Davis, Ivan Donev, Kevin Harner, Julie Jensen, Monique Newman, Michael Power, Kimbel Ritch, Brenda Roberts, Felipe Soltero, James Swift, Stephen Torres.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/21/2025. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Crumplar, Thomas) Modified on 3/14/2025 (nms).
March 7, 2025 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand - filed by Wayne Allen, Michelle Beebe, Severiano Celaya, Norberto Corona, III, Dakota Davis, Ivan Donev, Kevin Harner, Julie Jensen, Monique Newman, Michael Power, Kimbel Ritch, Brenda Roberts, Felipe Soltero, James Swift, Stephen Torres. (Attachments: #2 Proposed Order, #3 7.1.1 Statement, #4 Certificate of Service)(Crumplar, Thomas) Modified on 3/7/2025 (ceg). Modified on 3/14/2025 (nms).
March 7, 2025 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Memorandum of Law in Support attached to the Motion to Remand (D.I. #8 ) has been removed from the docket. Motions and briefs are to be filed independent of each other. Counsel is to refile accordingly. (ceg)
March 5, 2025 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation's Final Decision Whether to Transfer this Case to the In re AFFF MDL - filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order, #3 7.1.1 Certification)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 3/14/2025 (nms).
March 4, 2025 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Dakota Davis, Michael Power, Severiano Celaya, Julie Jensen, Brenda Roberts, Kimbel Ritch, Ivan Donev, Stephen Torres, Felipe Soltero, James Swift, Wayne Allen, Norberto Corona, III, Kevin Harner, Monique Newman, Michelle Beebe.(Crumplar, Thomas)
March 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion to Stay All Responsive Pleadings Pending JPML Decision on Transfer. Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 3/3/2025. (ceg) Modified on 3/3/2025 (ceg).
February 27, 2025 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Responsive Pleadings Pending JPML Decision on Transfer - filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Kelly)
February 19, 2025 Case Assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
February 14, 2025 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by 3M Company. (cdd)
February 14, 2025 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (cdd)
February 14, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Superior Court of Delaware, Case Number N25C-02-042-VLM (Filing fee $405, receipt number ADEDC-4614917) - filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(cdd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EIDP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont De Nemours, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DowDupont, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Signal Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clariant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daikin America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solvay Specialty Polymers USA, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Roberts
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Allen
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Beebe
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Severiano Celaya
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norberto Corona, III
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota Davis
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Donev
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Harner
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Jensen
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Newman
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Power
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimbel Ritch
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Soltero
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Swift
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Torres
Represented By: Thomas C. Crumplar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?