Collins, Jr. v. Records et al
Plaintiff: John Brian Sherman Collins, Jr.
Defendant: Mike Records, Terra Taylor, Monroe B. Hudson,Jr., John Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 1:2025cv00195
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Hall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2025 Filing 8 Authorization by John Brian Sherman Collins, Jr. requesting Prison Business Office to disburse payments to the Clerk of the Court. (copy of assessment order and authorization mailed to Prison Business Office) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (oam)
March 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff is required to pay an initial partial filing fee of $51.31. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Notice of Compliance deadline set for 4/24/2025). Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 3/25/2025. (Attachments: #1 Authorization) ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff on 3/25/2025*** (ceg)
March 18, 2025 Filing 6 Trust Fund Account Statement by John Brian Sherman Collins, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Copy of Order, #3 Envelope) (mrr)
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Motion to Proceed IFP (D.I. #1 ) is GRANTED. The trust fund account statement (D.I. #4 ) submitted by Plaintiff on February 18, 2025, is deficient in that it does not show all deposits, expenditures, and balances for the previous six months. Plaintiff shall be assessed the filing fee of $350.00. Plaintiff shall submit trust fund account statement. Failure to timely comply with this order may result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. (*Notice of Compliance deadline set for 4/4/2025). Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 3/5/2025. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff 3/5/2025*** (twk)
February 26, 2025 Case Assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 18, 2025 Filing 4 Trust Fund Account Statement - filed by John Brian Sherman Collins, Jr. (jfm)
February 18, 2025 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mrr)
February 18, 2025 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 against Jane Doe, John Doe, Monroe B. Hudson,Jr., Mike Records, Terra Taylor - filed by Laura Brackett, Kathy Sadler, John Brian Sherman Collins, Jr., Amigbo Toffa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mrr)
February 18, 2025 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by John Brian Sherman Collins, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Trust Fund Request)(mrr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins, Jr. v. Records et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Brian Sherman Collins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terra Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe B. Hudson,Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?