Wiggins v. Medical Services, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Nakia U. Wiggins
Defendant: Medical Services, Inc, H.R.Y.C.I. Corrections Parker, Natasha Hollingsworth and Medical Services, Inc. Mental Health Director
Case Number: 1:2025cv00224
Filed: February 25, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2025 Filing 10 Authorization by Nakia U. Wiggins requesting Prison Business Office to disburse payments to the Clerk of the Court. (copy of assessment order and authorization mailed to Prison Business Office) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (oam)
March 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff submitted a letter to the Clerk of Court indicating that their confinement at the Howard R. Young Correctional Institution did not begin until December 6, 2024, and that the original trust fund account statement submitted was reflective of all deposits, expenditures and balances to date. Plaintiff shall be assessed the Filing Fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $2.91 shall be required. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 4/25/2025. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/26/2025. (mpb)
March 21, 2025 Filing 8 Letter to Clerk of Court dated 3/11/2025, from Nakia U. Wiggins, regarding mailing of certified copy of trust fund account statement - re (D.I. #5 ) Order (PLRA) Missing Documents. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cdd)
March 11, 2025 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT for Magistrate Consent Forms. Acknowledgment filed by Nakia U. Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cdd)
March 11, 2025 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet for D.I. #2 Complaint, by Nakia U. Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cdd).
March 11, 2025 Remark: A Magistrate Consent Form signed only by the Plaintiff has been received and placed in the case jacket. (cdd)
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Based on Plaintiffs Application and Affidavit, the request to proceed in forma pauperis (D.I. #1 ) is GRANTED. Filing Fee of $350 Assessed. Plaintiff shall submit to the Clerk of Court, a certified copy of their trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Notice of Compliance deadline set for 4/4/2025.) (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/5/2025. (cdd)
March 5, 2025 Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 26, 2025 Remark: Civil Cover Sheet, Pro Se Privacy Notice, and Mag Consent Mailed to plaintiff (cdd)
February 25, 2025 Filing 4 Trust Fund Account Statement by Nakia U. Wiggins (cdd)
February 25, 2025 Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (cdd)
February 25, 2025 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against H.R.Y.C.I. Corrections Parker, Natasha Hollingsworth, Medical Services, Inc, Medical Services, Inc. Mental Health Director (IFP Pending) (No Civil Cover Sheet)- filed by Nakia U. Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - G, #2 Envelope)(cdd)
February 25, 2025 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Nakia U. Wiggins. (cdd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiggins v. Medical Services, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nakia U. Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.R.Y.C.I. Corrections Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Services, Inc. Mental Health Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?