BARNES et al v. USA

Plaintiff: JOSEPH BARNES, KAYLENE HOLUB and SOCORRO YOSUICO
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2004cv01335
Filed: August 18, 2004
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in the amount of $58,354.24 pursuant to the merits settlement and $390,000 pursuant to the attorneys' fees settlement. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Setting Fairness Hearing. Fairness Hearing set for 3/14/2011 at 2:00 PM (EST) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting 127 Motion for Extension of Time for class members to object to settlement of attorney fees, costs and expenses, and to extend related deadlines. Objections by class members must be postmarked on or before 1/24/11; class counsel and defendant shall file with the court their responses to any objections received from class members due by 2/21/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER re: 125 Joint MOTION for Settlement for Preliminary Approval of Settlement as to Attorney Fees. Class counsel shall mail the notice to all class members by 11/12/2010; All objections by class members must be postmarked on or before 12/10/2010; Class counsel and defendant shall file with the court their response to any objections received from class members by 1/7/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER: The parties have reached a settlement agreement regarding attorney fees in this case. On or before October 8, 2010, plaintiffs shall file a motion for court approval of the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 9/3/2010. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 7/7/2010. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 6/7/2010. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 PUBLISHED OPINION. The court grants the parties' motion for approval of their proposed settlement pursuant to RCFC 23(e). Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Resetting Hearing Time. Fairness Hearing set for 3/31/2010 at 1:00 PM (EDT) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying 109 Motion to file Memorandum regarding Attorneys' Fees and Costs Out of Time. Plaintiffs shall file their memorandum on or before Monday, March 15, 2010. Defendant shall file its response on or before March 29, 2010. No further extensions of these deadlines will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Striking 107 Memorandum as nonresponsive to the court order of November 24, 2009. On or before 3/5/2010, plaintiffs shall file a memorandum. On or before 3/19/2010, defendant shall file a memorandum responding to plaintiffs' 3/5/2010 memorandum. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 SCHEDULING ORDER: Class counsel shall mail the Notice Of Proposed Class Settlement to all class members by 1/11/2010. All objections by class members to the proposed settlement must be postmarked by 2/22/2010. Each party shall file a memorandum propo sing how issues concerning attorneys' fees and costs by 2/22/2010. Class counsel shall file with the court their responses to any objections from calss memebers by 3/24/2010. A fairness Hearing set for 3/31/2010 at 10:00 AM (EST)in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/7/2009 at 2:00 PM (EDT) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 12/18/2008 and every 28-days thereafter, until further order of the court. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/8/2008 at 2:00 PM (EDT) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARNES et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH BARNES
Represented By: Robert W. Brownlie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAYLENE HOLUB
Represented By: Robert W. Brownlie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOCORRO YOSUICO
Represented By: Robert W. Brownlie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Reginald Thomas Blades, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?