ARBITRAGE TRADING, LLC v. USA
Case Number: |
1:2006cv00202 |
Filed: |
March 13, 2006 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Presiding Judge: |
Unassigned |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 5, 2013 |
Filing
84
ORDER directing each party to file a supplemental brief, not to exceed 5 pages in length. Notice of Compliance due by 1/10/2014. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
December 2, 2013 |
Filing
83
ORDER granting 82 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact Discovery complete by 4/14/2014. Expert Discovery complete by 7/14/2014. Joint Status Report due by 7/28/2014. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?