April 6, 2015 |
Filing
143
OPINION (Redacted) re: 140 OPINION filed Under Seal. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
September 3, 2013 |
Filing
130
SCHEDULING ORDER: Brief due by 10/1/2013. Subsequent briefing shall be in accordance with the deadlines set forth in the RCFC. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
July 8, 2011 |
Filing
114
ORDER (redacted) re 111 Order on Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis) Copy to parties.
|
June 23, 2011 |
Filing
109
PUBLISHED OPINION (Redacted) re: 105 opinion filed under seal. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
June 3, 2011 |
Filing
103
ORDER: Trial was scheduled to begin in this case on June 13, 2011. That trial is hereby cancelled. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
May 24, 2011 |
Filing
96
SCHEDULING ORDER re:Motion to Dismiss: Response to defendant's motion to dismiss due by 5/27/2011. Reply to plaintiff's response due by 6/2/2011 at 5:30 p.m.(EDT). Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
May 17, 2011 |
Filing
90
ORDER granting 65 Motion in Limine; granting 66 Motion in Limine for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
May 16, 2011 |
Filing
88
ORDER: At the May 20, 2011, pre-trial conference, the parties should be prepared to provide the court with a revised witness list. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
May 13, 2011 |
Filing
86
ORDER granting 81 Motion for Authorization of Service 100+; granting 84 Motion for Authorization of Service 100+; and granting 85 Motion for Authorization of Service 100+. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
April 13, 2011 |
Filing
73
ORDER re 59 pretrial order: Pre-trial conference has been rescheduled for May 20, 2011, at 2:00 p.m. (EDT) at the United States Court of Federal Claims. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
March 29, 2011 |
Filing
68
ORDER granting 67 Motion to Amend Schedule. Defendant shall file its pre-trial contentions of fact and law, witness list, and exhibit list due by 4/22/11. No further enlargements of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
January 6, 2011 |
Filing
59
PRETRIAL ORDER: Parties shall have the Meeting of Counsel on or before 2/18/2011. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 3/7/2011. Exhibit List due by 3/7/2011. Witness List due by 3/7/2011. Response to Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 4/8/2011. Response to Exhibit List due by 4/8/2011. Response to Witness List due by 4/8/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2011 at 10:00 AM (EST)in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Trial set for 6/13/2011 at 10:00 AM (EST)in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
|
December 15, 2010 |
Filing
57
STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/4/2011 at 10:00 AM (EST) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
|
June 28, 2010 |
Filing
52
DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall exchange expert reports by 10/15/2010. Expert discovery completed by 12/16/2010. Joint Status Report due by 12/23/2010. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
|
June 21, 2010 |
Filing
49
ORDER denying as moot 48 Motion to Produce. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
|
June 9, 2010 |
Filing
47
PUBLISHED OPINION(redacted) to opinion 43 filed under seal. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
|
May 26, 2010 |
Filing
45
ORDER granting 44 Motion for an Extension of time to file expert discovery. Proposed Expert Discovery Schedules due by 6/28/2010. No further enlargements of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
|
May 5, 2009 |
Filing
21
ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to amend the schedule for briefing of dispositive motions. Joint Stipulation of facts due on or before 5/26/2009. Plaintiff summary judgment motion due on or before 6/16/2009. Defendant response/cross-motion for summary judgment due on or before 8/4/2009. Plaintiff reply/response due on or before 9/9/2009. Defendant reply due on or before 10/6/2009. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
|
February 10, 2009 |
Filing
17
ORDER granting 16 Motion to Amend Discovery Schedule. All expert discovery deadlines are hereby terminated, to be reinstated at later date, if necessary. Joint Status Report due by 3/27/2009. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
|
August 29, 2008 |
Filing
15
ORDER granting 14 Motion to extend discovery.Fact discovery due by 1/9/09. Expert reports due by 1/30/09. Depositions of expert witnesses due by 3/20/09. Joint Status Report due by 4/3/09. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
|