KISLEV PARTNERS, L.P
Plaintiff: |
KISLEV PARTNERS, L.P |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2007cv00625 |
Filed: |
August 22, 2007 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Mary Ellen Coster Williams |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 9, 2008 |
Filing
35
ORDER denying 28 Motion for Reconsideration, or in the Alternative, for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (pn)
|
August 13, 2008 |
Filing
27
PUBLISHED OPINION amending Opinion filed on 08/05/08. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (sd1)
|
August 5, 2008 |
Filing
25
PUBLISHED OPINION denying 14 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1); Status conference scheduled for 10/16/2008 at 11:00 a.m. ET.Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1) Amended by Opinion filed 08/13/08(lld).
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?