AMERGEN ENERGY COMPANY, LLC v. USA
Plaintiff: |
AMERGEN ENERGY COMPANY, LLC |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv00108 |
Filed: |
February 23, 2009 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Lynn J. Bush |
Presiding Judge: |
Christine O.C. Miller |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 13, 2014 |
Filing
112
REPORTED OPINION denying 96 Motion to Maintain Certain Filings Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order. The Clerk's Office is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant on Counts I-IV of the complaint, for the reasons stated in the c ourts opinion and order of September 17, 2013. The Clerks Office is directed to ENTER final judgment on Count V of the complaint, pursuant to the parties settlement and AmerGens Tax Matters Partners stipulation regarding Count V. Each party shall b ear its own costs.Unless otherwise directed by the court, the Clerks Office is directed to UNSEAL docket entries 1, 52, 53, 56, 58, 91, 92, and 93 on April 10, 2014. In the event that the parties agree that some exception to the unsealing of the abo ve-listed docket entries is warranted, the parties shall jointly FILE a Notice to that effect on or before April 3, 2014. In addition, on or before April 3, 2014, the parties shall jointly FILE, as separate docket entries, agreed-upon Redacted Versions of any sealed filing(s) that the parties agree should be excepted from the unsealing of the above-listed docket entries. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
|
November 14, 2013 |
Filing
109
ORDER granting 108 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 96 MOTION To Maintain Certain Filings Under Seal, Pursuant to Protective Order, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Response due by 11/22/2013. Reply due by 12/13/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
|
October 22, 2013 |
Filing
106
ORDER LIFTING STAY, SCHEDULING ORDER. Defendant's Response due by 11/15/2013. Plaintiff's Reply due by 12/6/2013.) Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
|
October 11, 2013 |
Filing
104
ORDER granting 103 Motion to Stay. Immediately upon restoration of appropriations to the DOJ, the parties shall CONFER and, as soon as practicablethereafter, shall FILE a Status Report setting forth an agreed upondeadline for the filing of defendants response to plaintiffs Motion toMaintain Certain Filings Under Seal before the court in this matter. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
|
October 8, 2013 |
Filing
102
PUBLISHED OPINION issued under seal on September 17, 2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
|
September 17, 2013 |
Filing
99
ORDER granting 97 Motion for Extension of Time to file defendant's response to plaintiff's motion to maintain certain filings under seal. Defendant's Response due by 10/17/2013; Plaintiff's Reply due by 11/15/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
|
April 10, 2013 |
Filing
73
ORDER granting 71 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The government's Response/Reply shall be FILED on or before April 26, 2013, and shall not exceed ninety pages; and Plaintiff's Reply brief shall be FILED on or before May 31, 2013, and shall not exceed forty-five pages. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?