RUBINSTEIN, ESTATE OF v. USA
Plaintiff: |
DAVID RUBINSTEIN, ESTATE OF |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv00291 |
Filed: |
May 8, 2009 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Margaret M. Sweeney |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 29, 2015 |
Filing
139
PUBLISHED OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (ta) Copy to parties.
|
January 31, 2011 |
Filing
42
ORDER DENYING 30 Plaintiff's Application for a Protective Order Limiting the Scope of Discovery, and GRANTING 32 Defendant's Motion for an Order to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Certain Interrogatories and Produce Certain Documents. Plaintiff, having waived its objections, shall serve upon defendant, by 3/4/2011, substantive and complete responses to defendant's first set of interrogatories and defendant's second request for production of documents. Pla intiff may file, by 3/4/2011, a brief setting forth its position concerning an award of expenses to defendant and citing, if it objects to an award, the specific reasons why it believes such an award of expenses is unjust. Discovery shall close by 5/3/2011. The parties' joint status report proposing further proceedings due by 5/20/2011. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (rac)
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing
31
UNPUBLISHED RULING DENYING AS MOOT 18 Defendant's Motion for an Order to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Certain Documents and GRANTING 25 Defendant's Motion for Extension of the Discovery Period. Discovery shall conclude by no later than 10/22/2010. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (rac)
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?