SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT v. USA

Plaintiff: SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2009cv00587
Filed: September 4, 2009
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Susan G. Braden
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 REPORTED OPINION granting 108 Motion The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (aw) Copy to parties.
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Corrected PUBLISHED OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (al) Copy to parties.
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 PUBLISHED OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (al) Copy to parties. Modified on 1/31/2013 - corrected pdf(jt1).
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden.(rr2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT
Represented By: Timothy R. Macdonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Scott Randy Damelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?