COLLINS v. USA

Plaintiff: RICHARD COLLINS
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2010cv00778
Filed: November 10, 2010
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Christine O.C. Miller
Nature of Suit: Military Pay - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER: The court hereby approves the parties' proposed notice and authorizes the parties to disseminate it to class members, contingent on modifications. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Setting Fairness Hearing: The parties shall file a proposed notice of preliminary approval of the settlement agreement by 11/8/2013. Fairness Hearing set for 2/26/2014 at 10:00 AM (EST)in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Rescheduling 88 Status Conference Order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/30/2013 at 10:00 AM (EDT) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/25/2013 at 2:00 PM (EDT)before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/2/2013 at 10:00 AM (EDT) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report regarding the progress of the class notification process due by 6/28/2013. Joint status report regarding the progress of the class notification process and proposing a schedule for further filings in this case due by 9/20/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/23/2013 at 10:00 AM (EDT) before Judge Francis M. Allegra Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 4/3/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PUBLISHED OPINION - Denying Defendant's 18 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) and (6). Lifting stay and Joint Schedule by Oct. 31, 2011, proposing a schedule for any discovery and briefing on plaintiff's motion 7 to certify the class. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLLINS v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD COLLINS
Represented By: Joshua A. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?